Pope v. Hillsborough County BOCC et al
Plaintiff: Lenwood Pope
Defendant: Hillsborough County BOCC and American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees
Case Number: 8:2022cv02092
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER terminating #17 #17 #18 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/4/2022. (CCB)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon consideration of the #23 Stipulation, this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions/deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/3/2022. (CCB)
November 3, 2022 Filing 23 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Lenwood Pope. (Scott, Kristie)
October 26, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE by Hillsborough County BOCC Local Rule 3.01(g) (Shaljani, Linda)
October 26, 2022 Filing 21 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Hillsborough County BOCC. (Todd, Stephen)
October 26, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Hillsborough County BOCC. Related case(s): No (Todd, Stephen)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is reminded that if motions to dismiss are opposed, a response must be timely filed addressing the merits of the motion. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/20/2022. (Jung, William)
October 18, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Hillsborough County BOCC. (Shaljani, Linda)
October 13, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rind, Osnat) Modified text on 10/14/2022 (SET).
October 10, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda Shaljani on behalf of Hillsborough County BOCC (Shaljani, Linda)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hillsborough County BOCC's answer or response due 10/18/2022. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/7/2022. (CCB)
October 7, 2022 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Hillsborough County BOCC. (Todd, Stephen)
October 5, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Osnat Kate Rind on behalf of American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees. Lead Counsel: Osnat K. Rind. (Rind, Osnat)
October 5, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Osnat Kate Rind on behalf of American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees (Rind, Osnat)
September 26, 2022 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, 3.03 by Lenwood Pope. (Scott, Kristie)
September 26, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kristie Ann Scott on behalf of Lenwood Pope. Lead Counsel: Kristie A. Scott. (Scott, Kristie)
September 26, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Lenwood Pope. Related case(s): Yes (Scott, Kristie)
September 26, 2022 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 09/20/2022 by Lenwood Pope as to Hillsborough County BOCC. (Scott, Kristie)
September 26, 2022 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 09/22/2022 by Lenwood Pope as to American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees. (Scott, Kristie)
September 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Todd on behalf of Hillsborough County BOCC (Todd, Stephen)
September 15, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
September 15, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CAH)
September 9, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Hillsborough County BOCC. (SET)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:22-cv-2092-WFJ-AAS. (SJB)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Hillsborough County BOCC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19976849) filed by Lenwood Pope. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit Opinion and Award Arbitration, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons for Def Hillsborough County BOCC, #5 Proposed Summons for Def American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees)(Scott, Kristie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pope v. Hillsborough County BOCC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenwood Pope
Represented By: Kristie Ann Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County BOCC
Represented By: Stephen M. Todd
Represented By: Linda Shaljani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees
Represented By: Osnat Kate Rind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?