Sherrill v. Carter et al
Plaintiff: Niketa Lashun Sherrill
Defendant: Kyle Carter and Emanuel Oropesa
Case Number: 8:2022cv02122
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER dismissing complaint without prejudice and directing Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/19/2022. (CCB)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 9/15/2022. (KME)
September 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kyle Carter(In Individual Capacity), Kyle Carter(Officer, In his official capacity), Emanuel Oropesa(Clerk, In his official capacity), Emanuel Oropesa(In his individual capacity) filed by Niketa Lashun Sherrill. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) No IFP. (KME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherrill v. Carter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Niketa Lashun Sherrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emanuel Oropesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?