Publix Super Markets, Inc. v. ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Defendant: ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company and XL Insurance America, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2022cv02569
Filed: November 11, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2023 Filing 74 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Fireman's Fund Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent AGCS International Holding B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE for Fireman's Fund Insurance Company.. (Russell, John)
January 9, 2023 Filing 73 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by National Surety Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Allianz of America, Inc., Corporate Parent Allianz SE, Corporate Parent Allianz Europe B.V., Corporate Parent AGCS International Holding B.V., Corporate Parent Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE for National Surety Corporation.. (Russell, John)
January 9, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE of compliance re 64 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, for Karen M. Dixon by American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company (Kammer, Ronald)
January 9, 2023 Filing 71 NOTICE of compliance re 64 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Sugzda, Alexander)
January 9, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of compliance re 64 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Frenchman, Kenneth)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ENDORSED ORDER granting #67 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/6/2023. (EPW)
January 6, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Latasha Lordes Chanell Scott on behalf of Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Scott, Latasha)
January 5, 2023 Filing 67 Amended MOTION for Karen Marie Dixon to appear pro hac vice by American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kammer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
January 3, 2023 Filing 66 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, a Swiss corporation, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, a New York Corporation, Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss corporation, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., a Delaware corporation for American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company. (Kammer, Ronald) Modified text on 1/4/2023 (MCB).
January 3, 2023 Filing 65 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Steadfast Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Insurance Group Ltd, a Swiss corporation, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc., Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company Ltd, a Swiss corporation for Steadfast Insurance Company. (Kammer, Ronald) Modified text on 1/4/2023 (MCB).
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ENDORSED ORDER granting #55 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #56 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #58 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #59 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #61 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #62 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #63 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Joshua A. Boggioni, Adam H. Fleischer, and Kevin F. Harris may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, and Great American Spirit Insurance Company. Attorneys Karen M. Dixon and Rebecca C. Dunn may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company and Steadfast Insurance Company. Attorneys Kenneth H. Frenchman and Alexander M. Sugzda may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Publix Super Markets, Inc. Attorney Susan Koehler Sullivan may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 1/3/2023. (EPW)
January 3, 2023 Filing 63 MOTION for Susan Koehler Sullivan to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20357292 for $150 by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Warrington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
January 3, 2023 Filing 62 MOTION for Alexander M. Sugzda to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20356815 for $150 by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified text on 1/3/2023 (MCB).
January 3, 2023 Filing 61 MOTION for Kenneth H. Frenchman to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20356688 for $150 by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Friedman, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 29, 2022 Filing 60 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Great American Insurance Company for Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company.. (Kammer, Ronald)
December 28, 2022 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Rebecca C. Dunn to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20346558 for $150 by American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing)(Kammer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 28, 2022 Filing 58 Unopposed MOTION for Karen M. Dixon to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20346526 for $150 by American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing)(Kammer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 28, 2022 Filing 57 Unopposed MOTION for Kevin F. Harris to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20346475 for $150 by Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing)(Kammer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 28, 2022 Filing 56 Unopposed MOTION for Adam H. Fleischer to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20346445 for $150 by Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing)(Kammer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 28, 2022 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for Joshua A. Boggioni to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20346367 for $150 by Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of Good Standing)(Kammer, Ronald) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 23, 2022 Filing 54 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald L. Kammer on behalf of American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company (Kammer, Ronald)
December 23, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald L. Kammer on behalf of Steadfast Insurance Company (Kammer, Ronald)
December 23, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald L. Kammer on behalf of Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company (Kammer, Ronald)
December 23, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of compliance re 47 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Sullivan, Daniel)
December 23, 2022 Filing 50 NOTICE of compliance re 47 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Shuster, Michael)
December 23, 2022 Filing 49 NOTICE of compliance re 47 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Kaminsky, Blair)
December 23, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of compliance re 47 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Heidlage, Benjamin)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #45 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #46 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Benjamin Heidlage, Michael Shuster, Daniel M. Sullivan, and Blair E. Kaminsky may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, Counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/22/2022. (EPW)
December 22, 2022 Filing 46 MOTION for Daniel M. Sullivan to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20335199 for $150 by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Warrington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 22, 2022 Filing 45 MOTION for Blair E. Kaminsky to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20335173 for $150 by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Warrington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 22, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Michael S. Shuster to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20335108 for $150 by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Warrington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 22, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION for Benjamin F. Heidlage to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20335073 for $150 by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Warrington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 21, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaylee Marie Chabarek on behalf of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation (Chabarek, Kaylee)
December 21, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Lavisky on behalf of Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Lavisky, Matthew)
December 21, 2022 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Maza, Jorge)
December 21, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge Alexander Maza on behalf of Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Maza, Jorge)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER granting #34 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants answer or response due 1/26/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 12/21/2022. (EPW)
December 20, 2022 Filing 37 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc. for St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company. (Briscoe, Edward) Modified text on 12/21/2022 (MCB).
December 20, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Russell on behalf of Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation (Russell, John)
December 20, 2022 Filing 35 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, ultimate parent and an NYSE-listed publicly traded company, Other Affiliate INA Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Company for ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Warrington, Alfred) Modified text on 12/20/2022 (MCB).
December 20, 2022 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #11 Amended Complaint, by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Main Document Memorandum of Law In Support of Unopposed Motion by Defendants for Extension to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Warrington, Alfred) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
December 20, 2022 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Nichole Flynn on behalf of St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Flynn, Ashley)
December 20, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Chloe Morgan Horton on behalf of St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Horton, Chloe)
December 20, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Briscoe on behalf of St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Briscoe, Edward)
December 20, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by James N. Hurley on behalf of St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company (Hurley, James)
December 6, 2022 Filing 29 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 28 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 27 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 26 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 25 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 24 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 23 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 22 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 21 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 20 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 19 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 18 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 17 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 16 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 15 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 14 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
December 6, 2022 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Friedman, Robert)
November 18, 2022 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. with Jury Demand. filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Friedman, Robert) Modified text on 11/21/2022 (MCB).
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED: Plaintiff's complaint #1 is DISMISSED without prejudice as a shotgun pleading. The Court grants Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this order, which must correct the deficiencies discussed herein. Failure to file an amended complaint within the time provided will result in the dismissal of this action, without prejudice, without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 11/17/2022. (MMS)
November 17, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robert H. Friedman on behalf of Publix Super Markets, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Robert H. Friedman. (Friedman, Robert)
November 17, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. (KME)
November 17, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Kenneth H. Frenchman, Alexander M. Sugzda, Jason D. Meyers Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the non-resident lawyer or the motion may be filed on paper; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME)
November 17, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel Alexander M. Sugzda, Jason D. Meyers, Kenneth H. Frenchman, Robert H. Friedman of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KME)
November 16, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Friedman, Robert)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:22-cv-2569-CEH-AEP. (SJB)
November 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company, American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company, Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Great American Assurance Company, Great American Insurance Company of New York, Great American Spirit Insurance Company, Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc., Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation, National Fire & Marine Insurance Company, National Surety Corporation, Navigators Specialty Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company, Steadfast Insurance Company, The Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company, XL Insurance America, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20189874) filed by Publix Super Markets, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5)(Friedman, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Publix Super Markets, Inc. v. ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Publix Super Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Robert H. Friedman
Represented By: Jason D. Meyers
Represented By: Kenneth H. Frenchman
Represented By: Alexander M. Sugzda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael S Shuster
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Benjamin Frederick Heidlage
Represented By: Blair E. Kaminsky
Represented By: Daniel Martin Sullivan
Represented By: Susan Koehler Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Guarantee & Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald L. Kammer
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Karen Marie Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
Represented By: John D. Russell
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Kaylee Marie Chabarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Assurance Company
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Ronald L. Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Ronald L. Kammer
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Spirit Insurance Company
Represented By: Ronald L. Kammer
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Jorge Alexander Maza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Insurance Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Lavisky
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Latasha Lordes Chanell Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew J. Lavisky
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Latasha Lordes Chanell Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Surplus Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Latasha Lordes Chanell Scott
Represented By: Matthew J. Lavisky
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Surety Corporation
Represented By: John D. Russell
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Kaylee Marie Chabarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jorge Alexander Maza
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Latasha Lordes Chanell Scott
Represented By: Matthew J. Lavisky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Chloe Morgan Horton
Represented By: James N. Hurley
Represented By: Ashley Nichole Flynn
Represented By: Edward J. Briscoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Karen Marie Dixon
Represented By: Ronald L. Kammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Represented By: Jorge Alexander Maza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred C. Warrington, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?