Wright v. Seacoast National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Lamont Wright
Defendant: Seacoast National Bank, Jason M. Ellison and Amy M. Williams
Case Number: 8:2023cv00100
Filed: January 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: Judge Amy Williams's motion (Doc. #15) for an extension is GRANTED. Williams must respond to the complaint not later than MARCH 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 3/9/2023. (KRM)
March 9, 2023 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Jason M. Ellison, Seacoast National Bank. (Ellison, Jason)
March 8, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Amy M. Williams. (Wilcox, Caitlin)
March 8, 2023 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Amy M. Williams. (Wilcox, Caitlin)
March 8, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Amy M. Williams. Related case(s): Yes (Wilcox, Caitlin)
March 8, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Caitlin Wilcox on behalf of Amy M. Williams (Wilcox, Caitlin)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Plaintiff's motion requesting discovery of facts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on March 3, 2023. (DD)
February 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason M. Ellison on behalf of Jason M. Ellison, Seacoast National Bank (Ellison, Jason)
February 21, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Jason M. Ellison, Seacoast National Bank. (Baylor, Matthew)
February 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Dean Baylor on behalf of Jason M. Ellison, Seacoast National Bank (Baylor, Matthew)
February 14, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery and not to Dismiss by Ronald Lamont Wright. (LSS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
February 9, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 2/2/2023 by Ronald Lamont Wright as to Seacoast National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(MCB)
February 6, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 1/31/2023 by Ronald Lamont Wright as to Jason M. Ellison. (AMS)
February 6, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 1/31/2023 by Ronald Lamont Wright as to Amy M. Williams. (AMS)
January 27, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Jason M. Ellison, Seacoast National Bank, Amy M. Williams. (MCB)
January 19, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2). -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY)
January 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason M. Ellison, Seacoast National Bank, Amy M. Williams Filing fee $402.00, receipt number TPA 67893 filed by Ronald Lamont Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(AM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Seacoast National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lamont Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seacoast National Bank
Represented By: Jason M. Ellison
Represented By: Matthew Dean Baylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason M. Ellison
Represented By: Jason M. Ellison
Represented By: Matthew Dean Baylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy M. Williams
Represented By: Caitlin Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?