Almaguer v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: William Almaguer
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 8:2023cv00325
Filed: February 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant's "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading" (Doc. #15) is granted. Defendant may file its response to the complaint on or before April 18, 2023. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 4/14/2023. (EKB)
April 13, 2023 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, / File Responsive Pleading by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Tolton, William)
March 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SELECTION of Jack L. Townsend, Sr. as mediator by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Tolton, William)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ERISA SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/24/2023. (SRC) (SRC).
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant's "Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading" (Doc. #11) is granted. Defendant may file its response to the complaint on or before April 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/23/2023. (ANL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, / File Responsive Pleading by Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Tolton, William)
March 17, 2023 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on March 9, 2023 by William Almaguer as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service of Process)(Steinberg, Michael)
March 2, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by William Almaguer. (Steinberg, Michael)
March 2, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by William Almaguer. (Steinberg, Michael)
March 2, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by William Almaguer. Related case(s): No (Steinberg, Michael)
March 2, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
March 2, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
February 15, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Unum Life Insurance Company of America. (LD)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/14/2023. (ABC)
February 14, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:23-cv-0325-TPB-TGW. (SJB)
February 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unum Life Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20510352) filed by William Almaguer. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Steinberg, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almaguer v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Almaguer
Represented By: Michael Alan Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: William Jeremiah Tolton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?