Vacondios v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTY VACONDIOS as parent and natural guardian of J.J. and Christy Vacondios
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina and Beall's, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2023cv00476
Filed: March 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1145 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Beall's, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina. (Alter, Daniel)
March 30, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Christy Vacondios. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Echeverry Prieto, Estefania)
March 20, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Estefania Echeverry Prieto on behalf of Christy Vacondios (Echeverry Prieto, Estefania)
March 15, 2023 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 03.10.23 by Christy Vacondios as to Beall's, Inc. (Santi, Maria) Modified text on 3/15/2023 (MCB).
March 15, 2023 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 03.10.23 by Christy Vacondios as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina. (Santi, Maria)
March 10, 2023 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 03/10/23 by Christy Vacondios as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.. (Santi, Maria)
March 3, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Beall's, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc., Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina. (MCB)
March 3, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 8:23-cv-0476-SDM-MRM. (SJB)
March 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20569225) filed by Christy Vacondios (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Summons BCBSFL, #4 Proposed Summons BCBSSC, #5 Proposed Summons Beall's)(Santi, Maria) Modified text on 3/3/2023 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vacondios v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTY VACONDIOS as parent and natural guardian of J.J.
Represented By: Maria T. Santi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Vacondios
Represented By: Estefania Echeverry Prieto
Represented By: Maria T. Santi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of South Carolina
Represented By: Daniel Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beall's, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?