Cellco Partnership v. Lasher
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless and Cellco Partnership
Defendant: Catherine Lasher
Case Number: 8:2023cv01242
Filed: June 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1) by Catherine Lasher. (Woofter, Daniel)
July 25, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Daniel H. Woofter and Kevin K. Russell of Local Rule 2.01(b)(1)(G), which requires members of the Middle District bar to register with the Middle District CM/ECF system by submitting an e-file registration through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #22 Motion for Daniel H. Woofter to appear pro hac vice by Catherine Lasher. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/24/2023. (SMB)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion for Kevin Russell to appear pro hac vice by Catherine Lasher. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/24/2023. (SMB)
July 24, 2023 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Daniel H. Woofter to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21072100 for $150 by Catherine Lasher. (Murphy, Evan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 24, 2023 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Kevin Russell to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-21072077 for $150 by Catherine Lasher. (Murphy, Evan) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
July 6, 2023 PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Evan Murphy (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA068819). Related document: #14 MOTION for Evan Murphy to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
June 30, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Evan Murphy Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission of Non-Resident Lawyer - Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court grants #13 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Maintain Redactions and for Leave to File Under Seal to the extent that Verizon may maintain the redactions as referenced in its motion. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/29/2023. (SMB)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's deadline to file the Motion to Dismiss is extended to July 28, 2023. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/29/2023. (SMB)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Evan Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/29/2023. (SMB)
June 29, 2023 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file DOCUMENT under seal and to Maintain Redactions by Cellco Partnership (Castellanos Alvarado, Maria Alina). Modified on 6/29/2023 to edit docket text (KNC).
June 28, 2023 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to dismiss by Catherine Lasher. (AG)
June 28, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance and Lead Counsel Designation by Evan Murphy on behalf of Catherine Lasher. Lead Counsel: Evan Murphy. (AG)
June 28, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Evan Murphy to appear pro hac vice by Catherine Lasher. (AG) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Unopposed Motion for Tara L. Elgie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cellco Partnership. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/28/2023. (SMB)
June 28, 2023 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Tara L. Elgie to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-20989553 for $150 by Cellco Partnership. (Castellanos Alvarado, Maria Alina) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 27, 2023 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Cellco Partnership (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Castellanos Alvarado, Maria Alina)
June 16, 2023 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Complaint /Petition to Compel Individual Arbitration and for Declaratory Judgment filed by Cellco Partnership. (Castellanos Alvarado, Maria Alina)
June 7, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Cellco Partnership identifying Corporate Parent Verizon Communications Inc. for Cellco Partnership. (Danon, Samuel)
June 7, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel A. Danon on behalf of Cellco Partnership (Danon, Samuel)
June 6, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Catherine Lasher. (LNR)
June 6, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LNR)
June 5, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SMB)
June 5, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SMB)
June 5, 2023 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:23-cv-1242-JSM-AAS. (ARC)
June 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /Petition to Compel Individual Arbitration and for Declaratory Judgment against Catherine Lasher (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-20903115) filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Verizon Customer Agreement, #3 Exhibit Declaration, #4 Exhibit Petition, #5 Exhibit Class Action Petition, #6 Exhibit Verizon's Rule 24 Motion to Strike and Rule 33 Dispositive Motion, #7 Exhibit Arbitrator's Order, #8 Exhibit Customer Agreement 1019 SCR12302021, #9 Proposed Summons)(Castellanos Alvarado, Maria Alina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cellco Partnership v. Lasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless
Represented By: Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Tara L. Elgie
Represented By: Samuel A. Danon
Represented By: Maria Alina Castellanos Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Lasher
Represented By: Evan Murphy
Represented By: Daniel H. Woofter
Represented By: Kevin K. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?