Larrazabal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Zulma Angelica Larrazabal
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 8:2023cv02081
Filed: September 14, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Philip R Lammens
2 Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2023 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 8:23-cv-2081-VMC-PRL. Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed no longer assigned to the case. (LMW)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on September 15, 2023. (BG)
September 15, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE: Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) became effective on December 1, 2022. The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules also apply to this proceeding except to the extent they are inconsistent with the supplemental rules. The Standing Order on Management of Social Security Cases entered on December 7, 2021, no longer applies. The parties must review the supplemental rules to determine the governing deadlines, including the deadline to file the plaintiff's brief, the Commissioner's brief, and the plaintiff's reply brief. (KME)
September 15, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
September 15, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
September 15, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
September 14, 2023 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:23-cv-02081-VMC-JSS. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. (JG)
September 14, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Zulma Angelica Larrazabal. Related case(s): No (Berke, Bill)
September 14, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Zulma Angelica Larrazabal identifying Other Affiliate Bill B. Berke, Other Affiliate David F Chermol, Other Affiliate Eric A Shore for Zulma Angelica Larrazabal.. (Berke, Bill)
September 14, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Zulma Angelica Larrazabal. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order IFP)(Berke, Bill)
September 14, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Zulma Angelica Larrazabal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CCS)(Berke, Bill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larrazabal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zulma Angelica Larrazabal
Represented By: Bill B. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John F. Rudy, III
Represented By: Nadine DeLuca Elder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?