Salelite v. Hillsborough County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Nisan Salelite, Nisan Adam Salelite and Herman Maurice Thomas
Defendant: Hillsborough County Sheriff's Office, Judge Mark D. Kiser, Public Defender Jennifer Elizabeth Dunne, State Attorney Susan S. Lopez, Jennifer Elizabeth Dunne and Susan S. Lopez
Case Number: 8:2023cv02387
Filed: October 20, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying #16 motion for transfer to federal custody. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/8/2023. (MWC)
December 7, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, re: to be maintained in federal custody by Nisan Adam Salelite. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(ABM) Modified on 12/8/2023 (ABM).
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER granting #10 construed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of the entire filing fee. Under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A), plaintiff is not required to pay an initial partial filing fee. However, plaintiff is assessed the $350.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 12/7/2023. (MWC)
December 4, 2023 Filing 14 RESPONSE re #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, filed by Department of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AM)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Mr. Salelite's claims against the Hillsborough County Sheriff's Office, Judge Kiser, Public Defender Dunne, and State Attorney Lopez are DISMISSED with prejudice. Mr. Salelite's claims against Mr. Martins, Officer Yost, and Officer Sparks are DISMISSED without prejudice. If Mr. Salelite wishes to amend, he shall file an amended complaint within THIRTY DAYS of the date of this order. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail to Mr. Salelite a copy of the standard prisoner civil rights complaint form. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/27/2023. (MWC)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 construed motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without prepayment of the entire filing fee. Under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A), plaintiff is not required to pay an initial partial filing fee. However, plaintiff is assessed the $350.00 filing fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 11/21/2023. (MWC)
November 20, 2023 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF re #1 Complaint filed by Nisan Adam Salelite. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LSS)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/20/2023. (MWC)
November 17, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File In Forma Pauperis form and for new form by Nisan Adam Salelite. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LSS)
November 16, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case in State Court by Nisan Adam Salelite. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LSS)
November 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 11/16/2023. (MWC)
November 13, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss State Court case 23CF006060A by Nisan Adam Salelite. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LSS)
October 26, 2023 Filing 5 RESPONSE re #3 Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, by Nisan Adam Salelite. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Within THIRTY DAYS of the date of this order, Mr. Salelite must either (1) file a fully completed Affidavit of Indigency form or (2) pay the $402.00 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Mr. Salelite an Affidavit of Indigency form. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 10/24/2023. (MWC)
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Nisan Salelite. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LSS)
October 20, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Nisan Salelite. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
October 20, 2023 Filing 1 **DISMISSED PER ORDER #13** COMPLAINT against Jennifer Elizabeth Dunne, Hillsborough County Sheriff's Office, Mark D. Kiser, Susan S. Lopez filed by Nisan Salelite. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope)(AA) Modified text on 11/27/2023 (GL).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salelite v. Hillsborough County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nisan Salelite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nisan Adam Salelite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman Maurice Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Mark D. Kiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Defender Jennifer Elizabeth Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Attorney Susan S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Elizabeth Dunne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan S. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?