Germantown Mutual Insurance Company v. Tollard et al
Plaintiff: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: William Robert Tollard and PR of Estate of Jonathan Ziegler
Case Number: 8:2024cv00167
Filed: January 18, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Natalie Hirt Adams
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2024 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 2/15/24 by Germantown Mutual Insurance Company as to Jonathan Ziegler. (Kiernan, Michael)
January 24, 2024 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 1/19/24 by Germantown Mutual Insurance Company as to William Robert Tollard. (Kiernan, Michael)
January 23, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC)
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KAC)
January 19, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Kiernan, Michael)
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Kiernan, Michael)
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael Keegan Kiernan on behalf of Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Michael K. Kiernan. (Kiernan, Michael)
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Ashley R. Kellgren and Michael Keegan Kiernan of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (HAI)
January 18, 2024 Filing 3 Entered in Error. (JCG) Modified text on 1/19/2024 (AG).
January 18, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:24-cv-167-JSM-NHA. (JCG)
January 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-21670883) filed by Germantown Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Grand Jury Indictment, #3 Exhibit 3-Criminal Case Jury Verdict, #4 Exhibit 4-Judgment of Guilt, #5 Exhibit 5-Policy, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kiernan, Michael) Modified to edit text on 1/19/2024 (HAI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company v. Tollard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Germantown Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley R. Kellgren
Represented By: Michael Keegan Kiernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Robert Tollard
Represented By: Christopher D. Smith, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PR of Estate of Jonathan Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?