Jones v. Kaushal et al
Plaintiff: Terance J Jones, Sr. and Terance J. Jones, Sr.
Defendant: Alash Kaushal and PTL Express, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2024cv00956
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2024 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (White, Johnny)
May 2, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by PTL Express, Inc. (White, Johnny) Modified docket text on 5/3/2024 (SET).
May 2, 2024 Filing 12 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Alash Kaushal. (White, Johnny)
April 24, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
April 23, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Terance J. Jones, Sr. (Henry, David)
April 23, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Terance J. Jones, Sr. Related case(s): No (Henry, David)
April 23, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by David Gerard Henry on behalf of Terance J. Jones, Sr. Lead Counsel: David G. Henry. (Henry, David)
April 23, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alash Kaushal, PTL Express, Inc.. Related case(s): No (White, Johnny)
April 23, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL David Gerard Henry of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (ABM)
April 22, 2024 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-956-MSS-CPT. (TNP)
April 22, 2024 Filing 4 COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO REFILE USING CORRECT EVENT. NOTICE by Alash Kaushal, PTL Express, Inc. of Pendency of Other Actions (White, Johnny) Modified text on 4/23/2024 (ABM).
April 22, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE by Alash Kaushal, PTL Express, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal of filing exhibits (White, Johnny) Modified text on 4/23/2024 (ABM).
April 22, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Johnny Deere White on behalf of Alash Kaushal, PTL Express, Inc. Lead Counsel: Johnny White. (White, Johnny) Modified text on 4/23/2024 (ABM).
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Polk County, case number 2024-CA-000228 filed in State Court on 01/18/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22004879 filed by PTL Express, Inc., Alash Kaushal. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 State Court ANSWER Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet (White, Johnny) Modified text on 4/23/2024 (ABM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Kaushal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terance J Jones, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terance J. Jones, Sr.
Represented By: David Gerard Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alash Kaushal
Represented By: Johnny Deere White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PTL Express, Inc.
Represented By: Johnny Deere White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?