Cooley v. Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC
Plaintiff: Janet Cooley
Defendant: Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC
Case Number: 8:2024cv01050
Filed: May 1, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Deceptive Trade Practices
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exacta Invoice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Joseph v. Rizetta & Co., No. 23-CA-001470 (Fla. Cir. Ct. Aug. 18, 2023))(Rottmann, Emily)
June 27, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Locke Beatty to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22241811 for $150 by Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC. (Rottmann, Emily) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
June 10, 2024 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement Under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Janet Cooley. (Newsome, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: The defendant's unopposed motion (Doc. #9) to extend the time within which to respond to the complaint is GRANTED. No later than June 28, 2024, the defendant must respond. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/28/2024. (CJR)
May 24, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC. (Rottmann, Emily)
May 24, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Yandle Rottmann on behalf of Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC (Rottmann, Emily)
May 13, 2024 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 05/08/2024 by Janet Cooley as to Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC. (Newsome, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2024 Filing 6 ***INCORRECT EVENT. COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECTUTED"*** PROOF of service by Janet Cooley (Newsome, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/13/2024 (LSS).
May 9, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Janet R. Varnell on behalf of Janet Cooley. Lead Counsel: Janet R. Varnell. (Varnell, Janet)
May 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/2/2024. (KMN)
May 2, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC. (JDR)
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-1050-SDM-TGW. (RLK)
May 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22048116) filed by Janet Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Summons)(Newsome, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/2/2024 to edit docket text (JDR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Cooley
Represented By: Jeffrey Lee Newsome, II
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Represented By: Brian W. Warwick
Represented By: Christopher J. Brochu
Represented By: Pamela G Levinson
Represented By: Paul M Messina, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exacta Land Surveyors, LLC
Represented By: Emily Yandle Rottmann
Represented By: Locke Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?