Charles v. MCR Health Inc
Plaintiff: Chrislande Charles
Defendant: MCR Health Inc
Case Number: 8:2024cv01100
Filed: May 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2024 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by MCR Health Inc. (Urie, Anna)
July 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court ordered Defendant to file an amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by June 24, 2024. See (Doc. 15). Defendant failed to do so. No later than July 8, 2024, Defendant must file the amended Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement. Failure to timely comply may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 7/1/2024. (ALE)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant's #14 Corporate Disclosure Statement fails to meet the standards this Court requires to effectively screen cases for potential conflicts. The Court requires parties to disclose "ownership however small of a party's shares or stock," not simply those whose ownership constitutes 10% or more. See (Doc. #5) at 7. Defendant must file a new statement using the form attached to the #5 Civil Case Order (also available on the undersigned's website) by June 24, 2024. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/17/2024. (ALE)
June 14, 2024 Filing 14 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by MCR Health Inc. (Urie, Anna)
June 14, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by MCR Health Inc.(Urie, Anna)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Finding good cause, the Court grants Defendant's #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. No later than June 14, 2024, Defendant must file a response or answer to the #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 6/10/2024. (ALE)
June 7, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna M. Urie on behalf of MCR Health Inc (Urie, Anna)
June 7, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by MCR Health Inc. (Urie, Anna)
May 17, 2024 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 5/13/2024 by Chrislande Charles as to MCR Health Inc. (Storch, Noah)
May 9, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chrislande Charles. (Kroboth, Andres)
May 9, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Chrislande Charles. Related case(s): No (Kroboth, Andres)
May 9, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Andres Kroboth on behalf of Chrislande Charles. Lead Counsel: Andres Kroboth, Esq. (Kroboth, Andres) Modified on 5/10/2024 (ARL).
May 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL CASE STANDING ORDER. The Parties shall meet and file a Case Management Report using the standard form on the Court's website within forty days after any Defendant appears. Each Party must also file a Corporate Disclosure Statement using the standard template attached to this Order (also available on the undersigned's website under the "forms" tab) within fourteen days after appearing. Signed by Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle on 5/9/2024. (ALE)
May 9, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to MCR Health Inc. (EAM)
May 9, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Noah E. Storch of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (EAM)
May 8, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Kathryn Kimball Mizelle and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 8:24-cv-1100-KKM-UAM. (RLK)
May 8, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MCR Health Inc with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22070904) filed by Chrislande Charles. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Storch, Noah) Modified on 5/9/2024 to edit docket text (EAM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. MCR Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chrislande Charles
Represented By: Noah E. Storch
Represented By: Andres Kroboth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCR Health Inc
Represented By: Anna M. Urie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?