Funk v. Secretary, Department of Corrections (Hillsborough)
Petitioner: Jason Matthew Funk
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Case Number: 8:2024cv01518
Filed: June 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Natalie Hirt Adams
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Salemi Ashby on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections (Ashby, Katie)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Respondent has 90 days to respond. Petitioner has 30 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/25/2024. (Attachments: #1 Service Documents)(TDC)
July 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Writ of Habeas Corpus FEES Paid by Jason Matthew Funk (Filing fee $5.00, Receipt Number ORL112255). (TRF)
June 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing Funk to pay the filing fee or file proof of indigency. Funk must comply within 30 DAYS. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enclose with this Order the standard form for a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/28/2024. (JT)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM in support re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jason Matthew Funk. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
June 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Jason Matthew Funk. ***NO IFP/NO Filing fee paid***(LD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/25/2024: #1 Mailing Envelope) (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Funk v. Secretary, Department of Corrections (Hillsborough)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary, Department of Corrections
Represented By: Katie Salemi Ashby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Matthew Funk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?