Davis v. City of Bartow
Plaintiff: Sheila Davis
Defendant: City of Bartow
Case Number: 8:2024cv02232
Filed: September 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #1 by City of Bartow. (Hearing, Gregory) Modified text on 11/19/2024 (MGB).
November 15, 2024 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Sheila Davis. (Florin, Wolfgang)
November 5, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Hearing on behalf of City of Bartow (Hearing, Gregory)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including November 18, 2024, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/4/2024. (DEJ)
November 4, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by City of Bartow. (Sullivan, Kevin)
November 4, 2024 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by City of Bartow. (Sullivan, Kevin)
October 22, 2024 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on October 14, 2024 by Sheila Davis as to City of Bartow. (Florin, Wolfgang)
September 30, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
September 25, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Wolfgang M. Florin on behalf of Sheila Davis. Lead Counsel: Wolfgang M. Florin. (Florin, Wolfgang)
September 25, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to City of Bartow. (MLB)
September 25, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Wolfgang M. Florin, Christopher D. Gray of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/23/2024. (KMN)
September 23, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-2232-MSS-TGW. (ARL)
September 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22547040) filed by Sheila Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Florin, Wolfgang)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. City of Bartow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Davis
Represented By: Christopher D. Gray
Represented By: Wolfgang M. Florin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Bartow
Represented By: Kevin M. Sullivan
Represented By: Gregory Alan Hearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?