Thompson v. Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC
Petitioner: Gwendolyn Thompson
Respondent: Amerilife Direct, LLC
Case Number: 8:2024cv02539
Filed: October 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. § 227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE Local Rule 2.01(c), Special Admission - File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Co-counsel with filing rights may electronically file the motion on behalf of the lawyer seeking Special Admission or the motion may be filed in paper format; Pay the Special Admission Fee; Submit a Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration through PACER. Visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers for details (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (CTR)
October 30, 2024 Filing 23 Case TRANSFERRED from the Southern District of Florida. Case assigned to District Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New Case Number: 8:24-cv-2539-WFJ-CPT. (CTR)
October 30, 2024 Filing 22 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:24-cv-60916. File received electronically
October 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Gwendolyn Thompson. The Clerk of Court is directed to TRANSFER this case to the Middle District of Florida. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
October 25, 2024 Filing 20 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Amerilife Direct, LLC. Attorney Matthew A. Keilson added to party Amerilife Direct, LLC(pty:dft). (Keilson, Matthew) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
September 9, 2024 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gwendolyn Thompson. Amerilife Direct, LLC waiver sent on 8/26/2024, response/answer due 10/25/2024. (McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
August 28, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue by Gwendolyn Thompson. Responses due by 9/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
August 26, 2024 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Amerilife Direct, LLC filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Gwendolyn Thompson.(McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Gwendolyn Thompson. Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC terminated. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall, within twenty-one (21) days of entry of this order, file an amended complaint with allegations against Amerilife Direct, LLC and then submit a new summons for issuance against it. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/22/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
July 19, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Party by Gwendolyn Thompson. Responses due by 8/2/2024. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
July 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint. Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC. Response/Answer due 8/5/2024. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/18/2024. (jgr) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
July 18, 2024 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order granting Extension)(Loe, Sandra) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
July 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURE: It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiff shall submit a motion for entry of Clerk's default no later than July 23, 2024. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/17/2024. See attached document for full details. (scn) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
June 27, 2024 Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline per DE 11: Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC response/answer due 7/15/2024. (pcs) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Senior Healthcare Advisors LLC, d/b/a Senior Healthcare Direct shall file its response to the Complaint by no later than 7/15/2024. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/26/2024. (jgr) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
June 24, 2024 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint by Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC. Attorney Sandra Ramirez Loe added to party Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/8/2024. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Ex. A - Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion)(Loe, Sandra) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
June 12, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Gwendolyn Thompson. Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC served on 6/4/2024, response/answer due 6/25/2024. (McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
June 6, 2024 Filing 8 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gwendolyn Thompson (McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (pcs) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER TO FILE CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONSWithin SEVEN (7) DAYS of entry of an appearance, each party, including governmental parties, must file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements that contain a complete list of persons, associated persons, firms, partnerships, or corporations that have a financial interest in the outcome of this case, including subsidiaries, conglomerates, affiliates, parent corporations, and other identifiable legal entities related to a party. The parties shall not include Judge Singhal or the paired magistrate judges unless they have an interest in the litigation. Throughout the pendency of the action, the parties are under a continuing obligation to amend, correct, and update the certificates. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/3/2024. (jgr) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
June 3, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions (and responses to motions) with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions (and responses). Motions for Extension of Time Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Labeling Exhibits on CM/ECF Exhibits to pleadings and motions shall be docketed in accordance with the Court's CM/ECF procedures, Rule 3L.(2): (2) Describing an Attachment to a Docket EntryA party filing an attachment to a document shall select one of the prescribed attachment categories from the drop-down menu (e.g., affidavit, transcript), provide an alphabetical or numerical designation (e.g., Exhibit A, Exhibit 1), and descriptively name each attachment (e.g., Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Boo Radley) in a manner that enables the Court to easily locate and distinguish attachments. (Emphasis added.) Notices of Settlement Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/3/2024. (jgr) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
May 30, 2024 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (nwn) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
May 30, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC. (nwn) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
May 29, 2024 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Raag Singhal. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]
May 29, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number BFLSDC-17566696, filed by Gwendolyn Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(McBride, Ryan) [Transferred from flsd on 10/30/2024.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Senior Healthcare Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gwendolyn Thompson
Represented By: Ryan L. McBride
Represented By: Mohammad Reza Kazerouni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Amerilife Direct, LLC
Represented By: Matthew A. Keilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?