Van Hofwegen v. Twitty
Plaintiff: Michael Van Hofwegen
Defendant: Mike Twitty
Pretrial Services: Carlos Burruezo
Case Number: 8:2024cv02557
Filed: November 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and GRANTING #18 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for the Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. In light of Plaintiff's having filed an Amended Complaint as a matter of course, Defendant's motion is denied as moot. Defendant shall be free to reassert any of the challenges raised therein to the extent that they remain viable against the Amended Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including January 15, 2025, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/19/2024. (KBC)
December 19, 2024 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Amended Complaint by Mike Twitty. (Kreider, Kirby)
December 18, 2024 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mike Twitty with Jury Demand. filed by Michael Van Hofwegen.(Berman, Craig)
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/21/2025 Pretrial statement due by 2/9/2026 Jury Trial set for 3/30/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 7 A before Judge Mary S. Scriven. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/7/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/18/2024. (BCH)
December 12, 2024 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Kreider, Kirby)
December 6, 2024 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mike Twitty. (Kreider, Kirby)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have up to and including December 18, 2024, to file his response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 12/3/2024. (KBC)
December 2, 2024 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Michael Van Hofwegen. (Berman, Craig)
November 19, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Mike Twitty. (Kreider, Kirby) Modified text on 11/19/2024 (JK).
November 15, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Mike Twitty. (Kreider, Kirby)
November 14, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Craig L. Berman on behalf of Michael Van Hofwegen. Lead Counsel: Craig L. Berman. (Berman, Craig)
November 14, 2024 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Michael Van Hofwegen. (Berman, Craig)
November 14, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Michael Van Hofwegen. Related case(s): No (Berman, Craig)
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #5 Defendant's Agreed to Motion for the Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including November 22, 2024, to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 11/5/2024. (KBC)
November 4, 2024 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to the Complaint by Mike Twitty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Order)(Kreider, Kirby)
November 4, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BCH)
November 1, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kirby Zoe Kreider on behalf of Mike Twitty. Lead Counsel: Kirby Z. Kreider. (Kreider, Kirby)
November 1, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:24-cv-2557-MSS-CPT. (ARL)
November 1, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Mike Twitty. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kreider, Kirby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Hofwegen v. Twitty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Twitty
Represented By: Kirby Zoe Kreider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Van Hofwegen
Represented By: Craig L. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Pretrial services: Carlos Burruezo
Represented By: Carlos J. Burruezo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?