Sanichara v. Geico General Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Marguerita Sanichara
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Co.
Pretrial Services: Carlos Burruezo
Case Number: 8:2024cv02635
Filed: November 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2025 Filing 21 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Geico General Insurance Co. with Jury Demand. filed by Marguerita Sanichara.(Rothman, Bradley)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/27/2024. (MEJ)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order Doc. #18, no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/27/2024. (MEJ)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/15/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the February 2026 Trial Term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/27/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/27/2024. (MEJ)
December 20, 2024 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Russell, Reed)
December 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time. (Doc. #15). The answer is now due January 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/2/2024. (DMD)
November 29, 2024 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Amended Complaint by Geico General Insurance Co. (Russell, Reed)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by December 20, 2024, file a completed uniform Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/21/2024. (DMD)
November 21, 2024 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of service by Marguerita Sanichara . (Cornell, G.)
November 15, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Marguerita Sanichara. Related case(s): No (Cornell, G.)
November 15, 2024 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Marguerita Sanichara. (Cornell, G.)
November 15, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
November 15, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
November 15, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/15/2024. (MEJ)
November 15, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
November 15, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by G. Ware Cornell, Jr on behalf of Marguerita Sanichara. Lead Counsel: G Ware Cornell Jr. (Cornell, G.)
November 14, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD)
November 14, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Geico General Insurance Co. (ARL)
November 13, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-02635-VMC-AAS. (AA)
November 13, 2024 FEE PAID. Filing fee for new civil case, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22715830 for $405 paid. (Cornell, G.)
November 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geico General Insurance Co. with Jury Demand filed by Marguerita SANICHARA,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cornell, G.) Modified text on 11/13/2024 (AA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanichara v. Geico General Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico General Insurance Co.
Represented By: Reed Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Pretrial services: Carlos Burruezo
Represented By: Carlos J. Burruezo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marguerita Sanichara
Represented By: Bradley Paul Rothman
Represented By: G. Ware Cornell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?