Ordonez v. Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A. Petersburg
Plaintiff: Yocelyn Ordonez
Defendant: Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A. doing business as Mai Dentistry of St. Petersburg
Pretrial Services: Carlos Burruezo
Case Number: 8:2024cv02660
Filed: November 15, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER: The parties have requested to mediate via Zoom. (Doc. #24). This request is denied. The Court firmly believes that in-person mediations are more productive than video mediations, and finds in-person mediation appropriate absent truly exigent circumstances, such as serious health issues. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/6/2025. (DMD)
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER appointing Carlos Burruezo as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for August 8, 2025, at 9:30 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/6/2025. (DMD)
January 6, 2025 Filing 24 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on August 8, 2025, 9:30 a.m. before Carlos J. Burruezo. (Longman, Troy)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/2/2025. (MEJ)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order Doc. #21, no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/2/2025. (MEJ)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2026 at 09:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the May 2026 Trial Term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/22/2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/2/2025. (MEJ)
December 27, 2024 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Edwards, Ashlea)
December 10, 2024 Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A.. (Edwards, Ashlea)
December 10, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A.. Related case(s): Yes (Edwards, Ashlea)
December 10, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashlea Ann Edwards on behalf of Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A. (Edwards, Ashlea)
December 10, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A..(Silverman, Scott)
December 10, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Scott T. Silverman on behalf of Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A.. Lead Counsel: Scott T. Silverman. (Silverman, Scott)
November 25, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Troy Edward Longman, II on behalf of Yocelyn Ordonez. Lead Counsel: Troy Longman, II. (Longman, Troy)
November 22, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
November 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by December 27, 2024, file a completed uniform Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/21/2024. (DMD)
November 21, 2024 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on November 20, 2024 by Yocelyn Ordonez as to Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A. (Longman, Troy) Modified text on 11/22/2024 (GL).
November 20, 2024 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Yocelyn Ordonez. (Longman, Troy)
November 19, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
November 19, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/19/2024. (MEJ)
November 19, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
November 18, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Yocelyn Ordonez. Related case(s): Yes (Longman, Troy)
November 18, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A. (LD)
November 18, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Troy Longman II of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LD)
November 15, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:24-cv-2660-VMC-AAS. (RLK)
November 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22726385) filed by Yocelyn Ordonez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Longman, Troy) Modified on 11/18/2024 to edit text. (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ordonez v. Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A. Petersburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yocelyn Ordonez
Represented By: Wolfgang M. Florin
Represented By: Troy Edward Longman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Pretrial services: Carlos Burruezo
Represented By: Carlos J. Burruezo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mai Family and Sedation Dentistry, P.A. doing business as Mai Dentistry of St. Petersburg
Represented By: Ashlea Ann Edwards
Represented By: Scott T. Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?