Thomas v. United States Postal Service
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Sheridan Thomas
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Case Number: 8:2024cv02937
Filed: December 20, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Lindsay S Griffin
Referring Judge: Kathryn Kimball Mizelle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed by Jeffrey Sheridan Thomas. United States Postal Service served on 1/13/2025, answer due 3/14/2025. (MCB)
January 9, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to United States Postal Service. (JKB)
December 26, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Order Referring Case to U.S. Magistrate Judge for IDEAL Program. See attached Order for important deadlines and information about the IDEAL Program. (ABC)
December 20, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Postal Service Filing fee $405, receipt number TPA #71506 filed by Jeffrey Sheridan Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (JKB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Sheridan Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?