Hernandez v. Sheuli & Mukul, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ciarajade Hernandez
Defendant: Sheuli & Mukul, Inc.
Pretrial Services: Carlos Burruezo
Case Number: 8:2024cv02956
Filed: December 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. § 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2025 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 5 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by Sheuli & Mukul, Inc.. (Lechner, Jay)
February 19, 2025 Filing 25 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Sheuli & Mukul, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Lechner, Jay)
February 19, 2025 Filing 24 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jay Paul Lechner on behalf of Sheuli & Mukul, Inc.. Lead Counsel: Jay P. Lechner. (Lechner, Jay)
February 19, 2025 Filing 23 RESPONSE re #13 Case Management Scheduling Order Answers to Court's Interrogatories filed by Ciarajade Hernandez. (Lee, Kyle)
February 18, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file the notice of mediation, listing the date, time, and location of the mediation conference, by February 21, 2025. The Court reiterates that it does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/18/2025. (DMD)
February 17, 2025 Filing 21 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #16 Amended Complaint by Sheuli & Mukul, Inc.(Lechner, Jay) Modified on 2/18/2025 to edit the docket text (RPB).
January 27, 2025 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on January 27, 2025 by Ciarajade Hernandez as to Sheuli & Mukul, Inc.. (Lee, Kyle)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on the efforts to serve Defendant by January 30, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/23/2025. (DMD)
January 21, 2025 Filing 18 SUMMONS issued as to Sheuli & Mukul, Inc. (BD)
January 20, 2025 Filing 17 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Ciarajade Hernandez. (Lee, Kyle)
January 20, 2025 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sheuli & Mukul, Inc. with Jury Demand. Terminating Purnata Enterprises, Inc. Filed by Ciarajade Hernandez.(Lee, Kyle) Modified text on 1/21/2025 (BD).
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Purnata Enterprises, Inc. has now filed a pro se letter as its answer to the complaint, claiming that it is not the entity at which Plaintiff was previously employed. (Doc. #14). Such pro se filing on behalf of a corporate entity is impermissible. "The rule is well established that a corporation is an artificial entity that can act only through agents, cannot appear pro se, and must be represented by counsel." Palazzo v. Gulf Oil Corp., 764 F.2d 1381, 1385 (11th Cir. 1985). Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to strike the answer. (Doc. #14). A proper answer must be filed by counsel for Purnata Enterprises. Given the allegations in the stricken answer, the Court also urges Plaintiff to review whether Purnata Enterprises is the correct Defendant for this action and, if not, to promptly amend the complaint to name the proper party. The Clerk is directed to promptly mail a copy of this order to Purnata Enterprises' address listed in the answer. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/17/2025. (DMD)
January 16, 2025 Filing 14 STRICKEN per Endorsed Order 15. ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Purnata Enterprises, Inc.(KME) Modified text on 1/21/2025 (BD).
January 4, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties are directed to adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order. This action is hereby referred to Carlos Burruezo, Esq., for mediation. The parties must mediate no later than March 21, 2025. Lead Counsel shall file a notice of mediation informing the Court as to the date, time, and location of mediation by February 3, 2025. Neither party may reschedule or cancel the mediation conference once it is set; leave of Court must be obtained before the mediation conference may be rescheduled or cancelled. The parties shall not mediate until the information exchange outlined in the Scheduling Order is completed. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, lead counsel must appear at the mediation conference. Lead Counsel shall file a notice informing the Court as to the results of mediation within 24 hours of the mediation conference. In the event mediation results in an impasse, the parties must file their jointly-prepared fast-track case management report within 24 hours of the mediation conference. Upon review of the jointly-prepared case management report, the Court will determine whether a case management hearing is necessary. If a case management hearing is necessitated, the Court will set the hearing by separate notice. Furthermore, if mediation results in an impasse, the Court intends to schedule this action for trial within 90-120 days from the mediation conference. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/4/2025. (MEJ)
January 3, 2025 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 12/31/2024 by Ciarajade Hernandez as to Purnata Enterprises, Inc. (Lee, Kyle) Modified text on 1/3/2025 (ABM).
December 27, 2024 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Ciarajade Hernandez. (Lee, Kyle)
December 27, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Ciarajade Hernandez. Related case(s): No (Lee, Kyle)
December 27, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Kyle James Lee on behalf of Ciarajade Hernandez. Lead Counsel: Kyle J. Lee. (Lee, Kyle)
December 27, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Purnata Enterprises, Inc. (MSN)
December 27, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kyle James Lee of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MSN)
December 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER regarding Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/27/2024. (KMN)
December 26, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
December 26, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
December 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
December 23, 2024 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:24-cv-02956-VHC-TGW. (JOS)
December 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Purnata Enterprises, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22850314) filed by Ciarajade Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Purnata Enterprises, Inc.,)(Lee, Kyle) Modified on 12/27/2024 to edit docket text (MSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Sheuli & Mukul, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciarajade Hernandez
Represented By: Kyle James Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheuli & Mukul, Inc.
Represented By: Jay Paul Lechner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Pretrial services: Carlos Burruezo
Represented By: Carlos J. Burruezo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?