Alford v. AdventHealth Castcare
Plaintiff: Felicia Alford
Defendant: AdventHealth Castcare a Florida Non-Profit Corporation doing business as AdventHealth Hospital at Wesley Chapel
Pretrial Services: Carlos Burruezo
Case Number: 8:2025cv00094
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant's Notice Regarding Mediation Scheduling. (Doc. #23). In light of the circumstances, the Court extends the deadline to file the notice of mediation to April 6, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/6/2025. (MG)
March 5, 2025 Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement filed by Felicia Alford. (Taylor, Robert)
March 5, 2025 Filing 23 NOTICE Regarding Mediation Scheduling by AdventHealth Castcare (Johnson, Viktoryia) Modified on 3/6/2025 (EVK).
February 25, 2025 Filing 22 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Robert E. Taylor, Jr. of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER: The response to the Motion to Dismiss, docket entry #10, is now due by March 5, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/24/2025. (Covington, Virginia)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed and Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. #19). Plaintiff's response is now due February 26, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/24/2025. (MG)
February 21, 2025 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, by Felicia Alford. (Taylor, Robert) Modified docket text on 2/24/2025 (JOS).
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding motions for summary judgment. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/19/2025. (MEJ)
February 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order Doc. #16, no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/19/2025. (MEJ)
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by October 27, 2025. Dispositive motions due by January 7, 2026. Pretrial Conference scheduled for May 14, 2026, at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Jury Trial scheduled for the June 2026 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 14B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Conduct mediation by December 1, 2025. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/12/2025. (GSO)
February 11, 2025 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Johnson, Viktoryia)
February 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. #13). Plaintiff's response to Defendant's motion to dismiss was originally due February 11, 2025. See Local Rule 3.01(c). Plaintiff's response is now due February 21, 2025. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/5/2025. (MG)
February 4, 2025 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement by Felicia Alford. (Taylor, Robert)
January 23, 2025 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 7 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule, by AdventHealth Castcare d/b/a AdventHealth Hospital Wesley Chapel. (Johnson, Viktoryia)
January 22, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by February 5, 2025, file a completed uniform Case Management Report. The Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery in the vast majority of cases. If the parties believe that more than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. After the Case Management Report is filed, the Court will determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/22/2025. (MG)
January 21, 2025 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement by AdventHealth Castcare d/b/a AdventHealth Hospital Wesley Chapel. (Johnson, Viktoryia)
January 15, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance and Lead Counsel Designation by Nicholas S. Andrews on behalf of AdventHealth Castcare. Lead Counsel: Nicholas S. Andrews, Esq. (Andrews, Nicholas) Modified docket text on 1/16/2025 (JOS).
January 15, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by AdventHealth Castcare d/b/a AdventHealth Hospital Wesley Chapel. Related case(s): Yes (Johnson, Viktoryia)
January 15, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.03, which requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
January 15, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c), which requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
January 15, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: The Court is aware of the notice entered in this case, explaining that Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the filing of a uniform case management report with forty or seventy days, depending on the circumstances of the case. However, under Local Rule 1.01(b), a judge can modify or suspend for all or part of an action the application of any rule, except Rule 1.05(a). This Court finds it beneficial to enter a fast-track scheduling order in certain categories of cases before entry of a case management and scheduling order. Additionally, in cases that are not fast-tracked, this Court finds it efficient to have the parties confer and file case management reports within 14 days after the defendant's responsive pleading is due or within 14 days after a case is removed to this Court. In light of this, the Court hereby suspends Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) in this case. At a time the Court deems appropriate, the Court will enter a further order in this case setting either a deadline to file a completed uniform case management report or various fast-track deadlines for the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/15/2025. (MEJ)
January 15, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MEJ)
January 14, 2025 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:25-cv-00094-VHC-SPF. (JOS)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sixth Judicial Circuit in and for Pasco County, FL, case number 2024-CA-002193 filed in State Court on 8/9/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22905593 filed by AdventHealth Castcare d/b/a AdventHealth Hospital Wesley Chapel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 State Court COMPLAINT, #4 State Court Docket Sheet, #5 State Court Other Documents, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Viktoryia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alford v. AdventHealth Castcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Alford
Represented By: Robert E. Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AdventHealth Castcare a Florida Non-Profit Corporation doing business as AdventHealth Hospital at Wesley Chapel
Represented By: Viktoryia Johnson
Represented By: Nicholas S. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Pretrial services: Carlos Burruezo
Represented By: Carlos J. Burruezo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?