DeCamp v. Road & Rail Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Hunter DeCamp
Defendant: Road & Rail Services, LLC
Case Number: 8:2025cv00186
Filed: January 23, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Natalie Hirt Adams
Referring Judge: Steven D Merryday
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Railway Labor Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2025 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under Rule 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 3.03 by Road & Rail Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Transportation Property Solutions, Inc. for Road & Rail Services, LLC. (Moody, Eric) Modified on 3/21/2025 to edict docket text (MSN).
March 20, 2025 Filing 17 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Road & Rail Services, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Moody, Eric)
March 20, 2025 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Road & Rail Services, LLC. (Moody, Eric)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: The defendant moves (Doc. #11) to extend the time within which to respond to the complaint. The motion is GRANTED. No later than MARCH 20, 2025, the defendant must respond. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/24/2025. (DJL)
February 21, 2025 Filing 14 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Nicholas Delton Thompson on behalf of Hunter DeCamp. Lead Counsel: Nicholas D. Thompson. (Thompson, Nicholas)
February 20, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Masterson on behalf of Road & Rail Services, LLC (Masterson, Brittany)
February 20, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Eric Brian Moody on behalf of Road & Rail Services, LLC. Lead Counsel: Eric B. Moody. (Moody, Eric)
February 20, 2025 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #5 Complaint by Road & Rail Services, LLC. (Moody, Eric)
January 31, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
January 30, 2025 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 1/28/2025 by Hunter DeCamp as to Road & Rail Services, LLC. (Thompson, Nicholas) Modified text on 1/31/2025 (GL).
January 27, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Nicholas Delton Thompson of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (FLY)
January 24, 2025 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Road & Rail Services, LLC. (MCB)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Nicholas D. Thompson may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, subject to the submission of the Pro Hac Vice E-File Registration (see https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers) within seven days of this order. However, going forward, counsel is encouraged to closely consider Local Rule 2.02(c)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams on 1/24/2025. (RAP)
January 24, 2025 Filing 5 COMPLAINT [CORRECTED] against Road & Rail Services, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Hunter DeCamp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Thompson, Nicholas)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER: The complaint (Doc. #1), filed in twelve-point Times New Roman, violates Local Rule 1.08(b), which requires at least fourteen-point Times New Roman. The complaint is STRICKEN. No later than FEBRUARY 7, 2025, the plaintiff may file a complaint that conforms to Local Rule 1.08. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/24/2025. (DJL)
January 23, 2025 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. New case number: 8:25-cv-186-SDM-NHA. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Nicholas D. Thompson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22941662 for $150 . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Natalie Hirt Adams. (RPB)
January 23, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Nicholas D. Thompson to appear pro hac vice, Special Admission fee paid, Receipt No. AFLMDC-22941662 for $150 by Hunter DeCamp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thompson, Nicholas)
January 23, 2025 Filing 1 ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #1*** COMPLAINT against Road & Rail Services, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405 receipt number AFLMDC-22941642) filed by Hunter DeCamp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Thompson, Nicholas) Modified text on 1/24/2025 (MCB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeCamp v. Road & Rail Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunter DeCamp
Represented By: Nicholas Delton Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road & Rail Services, LLC
Represented By: Brittany Masterson
Represented By: Eric Brian Moody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?