Anderson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Tisha Anderson
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 8:2025cv00192
Filed: January 24, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Lindsay S Griffin
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2025 Filing 19 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kevin Melnizki and Elie Anidjar of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (GL)
March 21, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER: "Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Initial Case Management Conference" (Doc. #17) is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/21/2025. (ANL)
March 17, 2025 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Case Management Conference to be Rescheduled by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Scheduling Order)(Russomanno, Suzette)
March 11, 2025 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel R. Agos on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP (Agos, Daniel)
March 11, 2025 Filing 15 NOTICE of hearing: Initial Case Management Conference set for MARCH 26,2025, at 09:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 A before Judge Thomas P. Barber. (SRC)
March 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: "Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Substitution of Parties and Motion for Remand with Incorporated Memorandum of Law" (Doc. #9) is denied. The Clerk is directed to strike "John Doe, as store manager" as a fictitious defendant in this action. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 3/11/2025. (ANL)
March 10, 2025 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Wal-Mart's Answers to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit "B" Declaration of Ashley Schilling, dated March 10, 2025)(Russomanno, Suzette)
March 10, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Glen B. Levine on behalf of Tisha Anderson. Lead Counsel: Jovanni C. Fiallo. (Levine, Glen)
March 5, 2025 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Russomanno, Suzette)
March 5, 2025 Filing 10 SECOND NOTICE TO COUNSEL Elie Anidjar & Kevin Melnizki of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
February 24, 2025 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Amend Complaint by Substitution of Parties and First MOTION to Remand to State Court with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Tisha Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Amended Complaint)(Levine, Glen) . Added MOTION to Amend on 2/25/2025 (LMW).
January 30, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Related case(s): Yes (Russomanno, Suzette)
January 30, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
January 30, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to file promptly a Notice of a Related Action identifying and describing any related action either pending or closed in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement. Counsel must make their disclosures using the standard court form. The Disclosure Statement form can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SRC)
January 29, 2025 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Other Affiliate WSE Management, LLC, Other Affiliate WSE Investment, LLC, Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Russomanno, Suzette)
January 29, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Suzette Luisa Russomanno on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Lead Counsel: Suzette Russomanno. (Russomanno, Suzette)
January 27, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL Kevin Melnizki and Elie Anidjar of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JDR)
January 24, 2025 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Lindsay S. Griffin. New case number: 8:25-cv-00192-TPB-LSG. (JOS)
January 24, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In the Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, State of Florida Civil Division, case number 24-CA-004265 filed in State Court on 9/23/2024. Filing fee $405, receipt number AFLMDC-22945881 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Demand Letter (Redacted), #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Unverified and Verified Interrogatory Answers (Redacted)., #6 Exhibit Docket Download, #7 Exhibit Medical records Redacted, #8 Exhibit Plf's Driver License (Redacted), #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Russomanno, Suzette) Modified on 1/27/2025 to edit docket text (JDR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha Anderson
Represented By: Elie Anidjar
Represented By: Kevin Melnizki
Represented By: Glen B. Levine
Represented By: Jovanni C. Fiallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Jerry Dean Hamilton
Represented By: Daniel R. Agos
Represented By: Suzette Luisa Russomanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?