AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC v. DIXIE COUNTY FLORIDA
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC
Defendant: DIXIE COUNTY FLORIDA
Case Number: 1:2007cv00018
Filed: February 6, 2007
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Dixie
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER adopting the magistrate judge's 202 Amended Report and Recommendation except as modified herein and except for the date on which interest on the award begins to accrue. The clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC, and against DIXIE COUNTY FLORIDA for attorneys' fees in the sum of $127,726.38 plus interest, at the federal rate, on the award from the date of entry of this order. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/23/2012. (djb)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting 201 MOTION for Reconsideration and vacating 198 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 171 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Determination of Amount) filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/6/12. (tss)
August 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting 164 Motion to Stay Court Order and finding as moot 162 Motion to Extend Time; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 8/15/11. (tss)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting 116 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 7/15/11. (tss)
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER granting 121 MOTION for Leave to File Reply re 120 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC and granting request for oral argument - Replies due by 12/3/2009 and oral argument to be set by separate notice; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 11/20/09. (tss)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 118 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DIXIE COUNTY FLORIDA, ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/12/2009).). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 11/3/09. (bkp)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 106 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC - Dispositive Motions to be filed by 9/25/2009 and response to be filed by 10/16/2009); signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 9/1/09. (tss)
March 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 85 MOTION to Compel filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC. The clerk is directed to issue subpeona, Set Hearings ( In Camera Hearing set for 4/13/2009 10:00 AM in Gainesville before SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/25/09. (bkp)
November 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 71 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC, ( Discovery is extended due by 12/12/2008.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 11/4/08. (bkp)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER adopting 64 Joint Report filed by AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC - Discovery due to be completed by 11/14/2008; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 9/11/08. (tss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC v. DIXIE COUNTY FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIXIE COUNTY FLORIDA
Represented By: MATHEW D STAVER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF FLORIDA INC
Represented By: GLENN MICHAEL KATON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?