HANS BIOMED HUMAN TISSUE ENGINEERING CORPORATION v. REGENERATION TECHNOLOGIES INC

Plaintiff: HANS BIOMED HUMAN TISSUE ENGINEERING CORPORATION
Defendant: REGENERATION TECHNOLOGIES INC
Case Number: 1:2007cv00177
Filed: September 24, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Contract: Franchise Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re: 69 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by HANS BIOMED HUMAN TISSUE ENGINEERING CORPORATION. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1;8cv9. (bkp)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 VACATED ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 12/16/08. (bkp) Modified on 12/17/2008 (bkp). per 68
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Joint MOTION to Extend Time of Discovery Deadlines and to Continue Trial Date filed by HANS BIOMED HUMAN TISSUE ENGINEERING CORPORATION - Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/19/2009 and Jury Trial reset for 8/3/2009 at 08:30 AM in Gainesville before JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE; signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 12/5/08. (tss)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 42 MOTION to Dismiss or For More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by REGENERATION TECHNOLOGIES INC, granting 48 MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion to F ile Ru le 7.1(B) Certificate Out of Time in Support of Defendant Regeneration Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum MOTION for Leave to File Unopposed Motion to File Ru le 7.1(B) Certificate Out of Time in Support of Defendant Regeneration Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum filed by REGENERATION TECHNOLOGIES INC, DENYING 47 MOTION to Strike or for Leave to File Reply Brief, etc. filed by REGENERATION TECHNOLOGIES INC, ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2008.). Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/30/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HANS BIOMED HUMAN TISSUE ENGINEERING CORPORATION v. REGENERATION TECHNOLOGIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HANS BIOMED HUMAN TISSUE ENGINEERING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGENERATION TECHNOLOGIES INC
Represented By: JEROME WAYNE HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?