WATERS v. CRIST et al
Plaintiff: LEONARD WINDELL WATERS
Defendant: CHARLES J CRIST, JR, MARGARET STACK, ELLIE WILKOV, ALAN WALDMAN, WILLIAM P CERVONE, RICHARD PARKER and CLIFFORD LEVIN
Case Number: 1:2007cv00184
Filed: September 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Adopting 10 Report and Recommendations. 13 Motion to Amend Complaint filed by LEONARD WINDELL WATERS is DENIED. Clerk directed to strike the 15 First Amended Complaint from the docket. Plai ntiff's 1 Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2). Clerk directed to note on docket that this cause was dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 2/23/2011. (jws)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 24 MOTION for Transcriptions of Report and Recommendations filed by Defendants and their Attorneys filed by LEONARD WINDELL WATERS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/27/2010. (jws)(Copy of 10 R&R to Plaintiff.)
August 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: No further communication from Plaintiff, STAY IS LIFTED, and the Court will go forward and render a decision on the recommendations and objections in due course. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 8/16/2010. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WATERS v. CRIST et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEONARD WINDELL WATERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES J CRIST, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET STACK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ELLIE WILKOV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN WALDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM P CERVONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD PARKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLIFFORD LEVIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?