FAULKNER PRESS LLC v. CLASS NOTES LLC et al
Plaintiff: FAULKNER PRESS LLC
Defendant: CLASS NOTES LLC and THOMAS G BEAN
Case Number: 1:2008cv00049
Filed: April 1, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 160 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 162 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 166 Motion to Strike 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Partial, 204 MOTION for Le ave to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, 160 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment, 166 MOTION to Strike 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Partial, 163 Statement of Facts MOTION to Strike 162 MOTION for Summary Judgment , Partial, 163 Statement of Facts ; granting 204 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 11/23/2010. (bkp)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER of Deficiency: re 164 Notice of Filing Exhibit in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Statement of Material Facts filed by THOMAS G BEAN, CLASS NOTES LLC - Clerk shall return DVD to filing party. Counsel may resubmit Exhibit I through CM/ECF as one or more PDF files using one or a series of docketing events. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/24/2010. (DVD returned via US Mail.) (jws)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO STRIKE, DEFENDANT'S COUNTER-CLAIM AND THIRD PARY COMPLAINT: FAULKNER PRESS's and MOULTONs 137 Motion to Dismiss, or alternatively to Strike is DENIED as to Count I. FAULKNER PRESSs and MOULTONs Motion to Dismiss, or alternatively to Strike, is GRANTED as to Count II. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/17/2010. (jws)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING 141 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions , Unopposed, filed by FAULKNER PRESS LLC. ( Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/22/2010.). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 2/24/2010. (jws)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 136 Motion for Discovery Order to Show Cause as to Why Defendant Class Notes Should Not be Held in Contempt by FAULKNER PRESS LLC. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 2/22/2010. (jws)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER DENYING 126 First MOTION for Order to Show Cause. GRANTING IN PART 127 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, insofar as the discovery deadline shall be extended, but DENIED in all other respects. ( Discovery due by 2/15/2010.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 1/13/2010. (jws)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING 97 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint and DENYING 120 MOTION for Status Conference. 108 Third Amended Complaint is accepted as filed. Defendants to file response by 1/15/2010. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/15/2010)). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1/7/2010. (jws)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER re 89 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel - GRANTED as to Interrogatory Nos. 3, 4, and 6; and DENIED in all other respects. Defendants shall provide responsive information on or before 12/28/2009. 110 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order - GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART. Plaintiff's 105 Motion to Compel AND 109 Motion for Discovery are DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 12/9/2009. (jws)
October 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER GRANTING 103 Motion for Discovery by Plaintiff. Defendants version of the confidentiality order will be entered after compliance with this order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 10/20/2009. (jws)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING 98 EMERGENCY MOTION IN PART. Deadlines for mediation and filing dispositive motions are stayed. Magistrate Judge Kornblum's orders regarding discovery remain in effect. Parties shall file a revised joint repor t by 10/30/2009. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's 97 Motion for leave to file a third amended complaint by 10/30/2009. 99 Notice of Appearance is accepted as timely filed.(Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/30/2009), Revised Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/30/2009.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 10/14/2009. (jws)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING 90 Emergency MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by THOMAS G BEAN, CLASS NOTES LLC. Matters STAYED for 14 days after entry of counsel or no later than 10/26/2009. On or before 10/26/2009, Plaintiff shall produce documents as directed in Doc. 88 , and Defendants shall respond to motion to compel. ( Miscellaneous Deadline - by 10/26/2009.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 9/15/2009. (jws)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING 83 Amended MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by THOMAS G BEAN, CLASS NOTES LLC. Defendants shall have up to and including 10/12/2009 to effect filng of a notice of appearance by a new attorney or pro se by Defendant Bean. ( Miscellaneous Deadline - by 10/12/2009.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/10/2009. (jws)
May 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 61 Amended Complaint (Unopposed) filed by THOMAS G BEAN, CLASS NOTES LLC - Answer due by 5/20/2009; signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 5/5/09. (tss)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by THOMAS G BEAN. 15 Reply to Response to Motion filed by THOMAS G BEAN is considered timely file. GRANTING Deft's 12 Amended MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint as to BEAN individually under an alter ego theory and GRANTING as to the claims for copyright infringement of unregistered works. In all other regards, the motion to dismiss is Denied. Pltf shall file an amended complaint that clarifies the remaining claims and the injunctive relief being sought by 4/20/2009. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2009.) Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/31/2009. (jws)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Amend Scheduling Order for Discovery, Mediation and Trial filed by FAULKNER PRESS LLC. All deadlines for discovery, mediation, and trial are stayed pending the Court's ruling on 12 Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint. After ruling is made, Court will issue a revised scheduling order.Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1/22/20009. Signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1/22/20009. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAULKNER PRESS LLC v. CLASS NOTES LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAULKNER PRESS LLC
Represented By: JAMES HADDON SULLIVAN, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLASS NOTES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS G BEAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?