MCMANUS v. GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY
Plaintiff: PETE MCMANUS
Defendant: GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY
Case Number: 1:2008cv00110
Filed: May 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 97 Report and Recommendation; GRANTING 81 , 82 , 91 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 1/24/2011. This case is dismissed. (kdm)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 83 , 84 MOTIONS for Extension of Time to File Response to 81 , 82 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by PETE MCMANUS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/12/2010).) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/12/2010. (jws)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/10/2010. (jws)
January 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: Magistrate Judge's 68 Order is VACATED and 75 MOTION for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint is GRANTED. 76 Fourth Amended Complaint is deemed the charging document in this case. 51 , 52 MOTIONS to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint are DENIED AS MOOT. Defendants shall respond to 76 Fourth Amended Complaint by 2/26/2010. Order terminates 74 MOTION to Appeal. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 1/28/2010. (jws)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER DENYING 71 Motion for Reconsideration filed by PETE MCMANUS. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 11/18/2009. (jws)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING IN PART as to extension of time but denied in all other respects re 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by PETE MCMANUS. ( (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/18/2009).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 8/26/2009. (jws)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 41 Report and Recommendation,, and denying as moot 26 Motion to Dismiss filed by PEGEEN HANRAHAN, and 27 Motion to Dismiss filed by JOHN CHERRY, SHIRLEY JONES, GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 5/13/09. The matter is remanded to the Magistrate for further proceedings (bkp)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING re 42 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by PETE MCMANUS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/10/2009).) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/30/2009. (jws)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 10 Amended Complaint filed by PETE MCMANUS; 26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by PEGEEN HANRAHAN; 27 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint & Memorandum of Law filed by JOHN CHERRY, SHIRLEY JO NES, GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY, : It is recommended that Defendants' 26 27 Motions to Dismiss be DEEMED MOOT, and this cause remanded to the undersigned for further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 3/3/2009. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/31/2009. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCMANUS v. GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETE MCMANUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAINESVILLE HOUSING AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?