GHASSEMIAN POUR BAVANDI v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE
Plaintiff: MADJID GHASSEMIAN POUR BAVANDI
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE
Case Number: 1:2008cv00178
Filed: August 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Naturalization Application Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and granting 12 Motion to Dismiss, filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE signed by JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 5/13/09. (tss)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss ,or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE : It is recommended Defendants motion to dismiss or,alternati vely, for summary judgment, Doc. 12, be GRANTED, and this cause be DISMISSED AS MOOT.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 3/26/09. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 4/23/2009. (bkp)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing service of 1 Complaint filed by MADJID GHASSEMIAN POUR BAVANDI; signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 9/8/08 - service copies returned to Plaintiff along with summonses, Consent to Magistrate, and a copy of Fed.R.Civ.P.4 (tss)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GHASSEMIAN POUR BAVANDI v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MADJID GHASSEMIAN POUR BAVANDI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?