SMITH v. CARLISE
Plaintiff: KEVIN JAMES SMITH
Defendant: TRACEY DARR CARLISE
Case Number: 1:2008cv00199
Filed: September 15, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Prison Condition Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Case is DISMISSED w/o prejudice. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/13/2009. (jws)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING re 8 MOTION to Extend Time filed by KEVIN JAMES SMITH. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 3/3/2009. (jws)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Complaint filed by KEVIN JAMES SMITH : It is recommended that this case be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 2/10/2009. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 3/10/2009. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. CARLISE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN JAMES SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRACEY DARR CARLISE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?