PORTER v. MCNEIL
Defendant: WALTER A MCNEIL
Petitioner: LARRY PORTER
Case Number: 1:2008cv00233
Filed: November 7, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting 22 Report and Recommendation, and dismissing case without prejudice re: 8 Amended Complaint filed by LARRY PORTER. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 7/26/11. (bkp)
March 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/10/2010. (jws)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: re 8 Amended Complaint filed by LARRY PORTER. Clerk to serve copy of 8 First Amended Petition to Respondent, WALTER A MCNEIL and Florida Attorney General via certified mail, return receipt requested. Respondent shall fi le an answer on or before 6/8/2009. Petitioner shall have until 7/8/2009 to file a reply, if desired. ( Answer due by 6/8/2009; Response by 7/8/2009).) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 4/6/2009. (jws) (Copy of First Amended Complaint and Order to Respondent and Florida Atty General via certified mail, return receipt.)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by LARRY PORTER. Clerk shall forward to Petitioner four (4) §2254 forms. Petitioner shall file an "Amended Petition" along w/two (2) identical copies including any exhibits or attachments retaining an identical copy.( Amended Pleadings due by 4/6/2009.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 3/3/2009. (jws)(Four (4) §2255 forms forwarded to Petitioner w/order.)
November 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED: Petitioner, LARRY PORTER, pay filing fee or file Motion for IFP; Walter McNeil SUBSTITUTED for State of Florida as proper respondent. (Filing Fee $5.00 due by 12/15/2008 OR Motion for IFP due by 12/15/2008.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 11/12/2008. (jws) (IFP form sent to Petitioner.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PORTER v. MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LARRY PORTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTER A MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?