BELL v FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, et al

Plaintiff: JACKIE MICHAEL BELL
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Case Number: 1:2009cv00176
Filed: August 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Referring Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 21 Motion for Reconsideration of 20 Clerk's Judgment, 19 Order On Report and Recommendation filed by JACKIE MICHAEL BELL. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 5/17/2011. (jws)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: 12 Motion to Amend is DENIED; 15 Motion to serve complaint is DENIED. Adopting 7 Report and Recommendations - Case is DISMISSED and Clerk directed to close file. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/16/2011. (jws)
September 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Until such time as the Court rules on the R&R, the complaint will not be served, and Plaintiff's request that this case be given expedited consideration is DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 9/27/2010. (jws)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Stephan P Mickle on 3/10/2010. (jws)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 7 Report and Recommendation. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 2/9/2010. This case is dismissed and the Clerk is directed to close the file. (kdm)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 6 Amended Complaint filed by JACKIE MICHAEL BELL - It is recommended that Plaintiffs amended complaint, doc. 6 , be DISMISSED with prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction.. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 12/17/2009. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 1/14/2010. (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BELL v FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACKIE MICHAEL BELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?