SPANN v. ASTRUE
Plaintiff: LILLIAN SPANN
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Case Number: 1:2009cv00199
Filed: September 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by LILLIAN SPANN: Decision of the Commissioner is AFFIRMED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 7/28/2010. (jws)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING 19 Second MOTION to Extend Time filed by MICHAEL J ASTRUE. (Memorandum in Opposition due by 5/10/2010.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 4/7/2010. (jws)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/10/2010. (jws)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 15 MOTION to Extend Time filed by MICHAEL J ASTRUE. ( Memorandum in Opposition due by 4/5/2010.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/5/2010. (jws)
February 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 MOTION to Extend Time to File Memorandum of Law filed by LILLIAN SPANN. ( Memorandum in Support due by 2/5/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 2/3/2010. (jws)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED: re 1 Complaint filed by LILLIAN SPANN, 9 Answer to Complaint filed by MICHAEL J ASTRUE. Memorandum in Opposition due by 3/2/2010., Memorandum in Support due by 2/1/2010. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 11/30/2009. (jws)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by LILLIAN SPANN. Clerk of Court directed to prepare summons, four certified copies of this order, service copies of 1 Complaint, and USM 285 forms to U.S. Ma rshal. Any paper submitted for filing after a response to the complaint has been filed by Defendants that does not contain a "certificate of service" shall be returned by the clerk and disregarded by the court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ALLAN KORNBLUM on 9/17/2009. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SPANN v. ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LILLIAN SPANN
Represented By: N ALBERT BACHARACH, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL J ASTRUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?