GREEN v. MCNEIL
Petitioner: DANNY ALLEN GREEN
Respondent: WALTER A MCNEIL
Case Number: 1:2009cv00204
Filed: September 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER re 76 Response (Construed as Motion) filed by DANNY ALLEN GREEN is DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 10/21/2011. (jws)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Accepting 67 Report and Recommendation except for statement that J.S. was a minor. 1 Petition for writ of habeas corpus is DENIED. 68 Motion To Remove Strike is DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 7/14/2011. (jws)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 61 Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's 60 Order filed by DANNY ALLEN GREEN. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 6/22/2011. (jws)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING 64 Motion to Seal filed by DANNY ALLEN GREEN. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/31/2011. (jws)
September 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER: 54 MOTION for Hearing filed by DANNY ALLEN GREEN is STRICKEN. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/20/2010. (jws)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER denying 37 Motion For Immediate Release From Custody and Reply to Answer re 34 Response to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus; denying 44 Motion for Hearing; denying 45 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 5/13/10. (bkp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GREEN v. MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DANNY ALLEN GREEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WALTER A MCNEIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?