BARTRAM LLC v. C B CONTRACTORS LLC
Plaintiff: BARTRAM LLC
Defendant: C B CONTRACTORS LLC
Case Number: 1:2009cv00254
Filed: December 11, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER granting 496 MOTION for a Pretrial Status Conference filed by CB CONTRACTORS LLC. A telephonic hearing is scheduled for set for 3/21/2012 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Jones. CB CONTRACTORS LLC shall initiate the conference call. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/13/2012. (jws)
March 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 500 ORDER re 499 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Third Party Defendant/Fourth Party Plaintiff, LOWRY CONSTRUCTION & FRAMING INC is GRANTED. Discovery deadline extended for sole purpose of allowing parties to conduct deposition of Jeanette Rivera of Brickell Group Construction, Inc and obtain relevant documents. (Discovery due by 4/6/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/8/2012. (jws)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 489 ORDER: Discovery due by 3/30/2012. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/7/2012. (jws)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER GRANTING 468 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 447 MOTION in Limine filed by CAMBRIDGE BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS LLC, CB CONTRACTORS LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/6/2012).). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1/30/2012. (jws)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER re 412 Motion to Compel E-Mails for Deposition by BARTRAM LLC is GRANTED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/23/2011. (jws)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER re 401 Motion to Compel Deposition of Rick Alcala by C B CONTRACTORS LLC is GRANTED consistent w/directives w/n this Order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/15/2011. (jws)
December 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 395 ORDER GRANTING 394 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY to CB CONTRACTORS LLC's Response to Motion to Compel Compliance with Scheduling Order filed by DUFFIELD ALUMINUM. (Reply due by 12/13/2011.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 12/9/2011. (jws)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER re 343 MOTION to Extend Timeof the Court Ordered Mediation Deadline and Motion to Compel Mediation filed by CB CONTRACTORS LLC is GRANTED. Parties shall complete mediation of the Third and Fourth party claims. Parties, along w/their trial counsel and designated corporate and insurance claims representative, must appear in person. (Mediation to take place by 1/31/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 11/22/2011. (jws)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER re 344 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 334 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CAMBRIDGE BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS LLC is GRANTED. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/3/2011).). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 10/18/2011. (jws)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER re 329 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines filed by CB CONTRACTORS LLC is GRANTED. (Discovery due by 1/31/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/27/2011. (jws)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER re 307 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time to Serve Fourth Parties, EAST COAST CONSTRUCTION LLC, GALANES CONSTRUCTION INC, ROSE CONSTRUCTION INC and ZM CONSTRUCTION INC filed by Third Party Defendant/Fourth Party Plaintiff, LOWRY CONSTRUCTION & FRAMING INC is GRANTED. No further extensions of time for completing service will be granted. (Deadline to perfect service by 11/14/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/13/2011. (jws)
July 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER re 290 Motion to Vacate 223 Clerk's Entry of Default against THE LOYD GROUP INC on Third Party Complaint is GRANTED. 223 Clerk's Default dated 4/12/2011 is SET ASIDE. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 7/26/2011. (Copy of order mailed to Atty Gordon.) (jws)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER DENYING 221 MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY: Plaintiffs 221 Motion Requesting Certification of Order on Cross Motions for 214 Partial Summary Judgment for Immediate Appeal is denied. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 6/28/2011. (jws)
June 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER re 260 Notice of Hearing - Status Conference set for 6/30/2011 02:00 PM is CANCELED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/27/2011. (jws)
June 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER granting 219 Motion for Clarification of 214 Order by Plaintiff. Court clarifies that the Order on Cross Motions for Partial Summary Judgment is limited to the breach of contract claims. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 6/22/2011. (jws)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ORDER granting 272 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonic for Status Conference by DAI-COLE WATERPROOFING COMPANY INC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/16/2011. (jws)
June 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER granting 270 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonic at Status Conference by FLOOR CRETE ENTERPRISES INC. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 6/14/2011. (jws)
June 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER GRANTING 267 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonic by DUFFIELD ALUMINUM. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/9/2011. (jws)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING 261 , 263 , 264 , 265 Motions for Leave to Appear telephonic at Status Conference on 6/30/2011 by CAMBRIDGE BUILDERS & CONTRACTORS LLC, CB CONTRACTORS LLC, RIDGWAY ROOF TRUSS CO, SPEED FRAMING INC, FLORIDA STATE PLASTERING LLC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/8/2011. (jws)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER GRANTING 256 , 258 , 259 Motions for Leave to Appear telephonic for 6/30/2011 Status Conference. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/7/2011. (jws)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER re 254 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by FLOOR CRETE ENTERPRISES INC is GRANTED. (Miscellaneous Deadline for disclosure of rebuttal expert witnesses and opinions - by 6/27/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 6/3/2011. (jws)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER GRANTING 250 First MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by SPEED FRAMING INC. 218 Clerk's Entry of Default against SPEED FRAMING INC dated 5/5/2011 is SET ASIDE. SPEED FRAMING INC shall respond to LOWRY CONSTRUCTION & FRAMING INC's Fourth Party Complaint by 6/3/2011. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/31/2011. (Answer due by 6/3/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/31/2011. (jws)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING 247 MOTION to Vacate 230 Clerk's Entry of Default as Agreed to by BK WATERPROOFING INC by DAI-COLE WATERPROOFING, INC. Clerk's 230 Default entered 4/25/2011 is SET ASIDE. BK WATERPROOFING INC shall respond to DAI-COLE's Third Party Complaint by 6/14/2011. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 6/14/2011).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/25/2011. (jws)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 245 ORDER GRANTING 243 Second MOTION to Extend Time To Perfect Service filed by Third Party Defendant/Fourth Party Plaintiff, LOWRY CONSTRUCTION & FRAMING INC. Deadline to perfect service upon EAST COAST CONSTRUCTION LLC, GALANES CONSTRUCTION INC, ROSE CONSTRUCTION INC, and ZM CONSTRUCTION INC is extended to 9/13/2011. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/17/2011. (jws)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/31/11. (bkp)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING 199 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonically for status conference scheduled for 3/28/2011 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Third Party Defendant LOWRY CONSTRUCTION & FRAMING INC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/22/2011. (jws)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING 193 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Status Conference Scheduled for 3/28/2011 at 2:00 p.m. filed by DAI-COLE WATERPROOFING COMPANY INC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/16/2011. (jws)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER GRANTING 186 , 187 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonically at Status Conference scheduled for 3/28/2011 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Third Party Defendants, THE PRESTON PARTNERSHIP LLC, ECHELON ENGINEERING LLC, and FLOOR CRETE ENTERPRISES INC. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/15/2011. (jws)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING 182 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically by DUFFIELD ALUMINUM at Status Conference scheduled for 3/28/2011 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/14/2011. (jws)
March 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING 180 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Status Conference scheduled for 3/28/2011 at 2:00 p.m. filed by third party Defendant, DUFFIELD ALUMINUM d/b/a DHI Roofing. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/11/2011. (jws)
March 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER GRANTING 178 Motion for Leave to Appear telephonically for Status Conference set for 3/28/2011 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Third Party Defendant RIDGWAY ROOF TRUSS CO. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/10/2011. (jws)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER GRANTING 175 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by ECHELON ENGINEERING LLC. (Answer to 136 Amended Third Party Complaint filed by CB CONTRACTORS, LLC due by 3/16/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/8/2011. (jws)
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER GRANTING 169 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer 136 Amended Third Party Complaint filed by THE PRESTON PARTNERSHIP LLC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/16/2011).). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/28/2011. (jws)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER GRANTING 142 MOTION to Extend Time and to Permit Substituted Service of Process on BK Waterproofing, Inc. filed by DAI-COLE WATERPROOFING COMPANY INC. Substituted service of process shall be completed by 3/14/2011. Clerk directed to issue summons upon presentation of Alias Summons. (Miscellaneous (Service of process) Deadline - by 3/14/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/4/2011. (jws)
January 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING 135 MOTION to Amend/Correct Third Party Complaint and Memorandum of Law filed by CB CONTRACTORS LLC. 136 Amended Third Party Complaint is accepted as filed. CB CONTRACTORS LLC shall serve process on the new Third-Party Defendants forthwith and serve them with the Court's modified 13 scheduling order and all pending notices of depositions. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1/27/2011. (jws)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re 113 Stipulation filed by CB CONTRACTORS LLC to Set Aside 87 Clerk's Default against FLOOR CRETE is VACATED and SET ASIDE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 1/7/2011. (jws)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER GRANTING 114 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BARTRAM LLC. Plaintiff shall file a reply not to exeed ten pages by 10/8/2010. Defendants, C.B. CONTRACTORS AND CAMBRIDGE BUILDERS shall file a sur-reply not to exceed ten pages by 10/15/2010. (Miscellaneous (Sur-reply) Deadline - by 10/15/2010., Replies due by 10/8/2010.). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/29/2010. (jws)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER GRANTING 100 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CB CONTRACTORS LLC. ( Replies due by 9/7/2010.). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 8/30/2010. (jws)
August 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 60 Motion to Dismiss Count XVI of the Third-Party Complaint by DAI-COLE WATERPROOFING COMPANY INC. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 8/19/2010. (jws)
August 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: 68 First MOTION for Protective Order and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by DUFFIELD ALUMINUM is MOOT. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 8/18/2010. (jws)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER GRANTING 81 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 60 MOTION to Dismiss Count XVI of Third-Party Complaint filed by CB CONTRACTORS LLC, response due by 8/16/2010; GRANTING 82 First MOTION for E xtension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by BARTRAM LLC, response due by 8/23/2010. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/16/2010)., Miscellaneous Deadline - by 8/23/2010.). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 8/11/2010. (jws)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DENYING 54 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, or for Improper Venue; GRANTING 70 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; DENYING 71 Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 8/10/2010. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARTRAM LLC v. C B CONTRACTORS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARTRAM LLC
Represented By: DAVID MICHAEL ADELSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C B CONTRACTORS LLC
Represented By: CARLA MICHELLE HOWARD-TORRES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?