YOUNG, et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: TONY CHOY YOUNG and SHELLY DAWN CARVER
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2009cv00266
Filed: December 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Dixie
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to Plaintiff's 19 Notice of Settlement case is DISMISSED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 5/23/2011. (jws)
March 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 17 Amended MOTION to Extend Time to Disclose Expert Witnesses filed by SHELLY DAWN CARVER, TONY CHOY YOUNG. (Defendant Expert Witness List due by 9/5/2011.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/28/2011. (jws)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING 14 MOTION to Extend Time to Disclose Expert Witnesses filed by SHELLY DAWN CARVER, TONY CHOY YOUNG. (Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/20/2011, Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 8/5/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/22/2011. (jws)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 MOTION to Extend Time to Disclose Expert Witnesses filed by SHELLY DAWN CARVER, TONY CHOY YOUNG. (Plaintiff Expert Witness List due by 3/20/2011.), (Defendant Expert Witness List due by 5/5/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/22/2010. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG, et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONY CHOY YOUNG
Represented By: R DOUGLAS HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHELLY DAWN CARVER
Represented By: R DOUGLAS HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?