DAVIS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Plaintiff: JIMMY EARL DAVIS
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and HASSETT
Case Number: 1:2010cv00029
Filed: February 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ON 40 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Adopting R&R - Plaintiffs 36 Third Amended Complaint is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/12/2011. (jws)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 38 Motion For Emergency Intervention signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 1/27/11. (tss)
May 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by JIMMY EARL DAVIS. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/14/2010.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 5/13/2010. (jws)
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a §1983 form. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2010.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 4/23/2010. (Forwarded to Plaintiff §1983 form.) (jws)
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Partial Filing Fee filed by JIMMY EARL DAVIS. Plaintiff shall have through 4/23/2010 to pay the initial filing fee assessed by previous 7 Order. ( Fee due by 4/23/2010.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 4/2/2010. (jws)
March 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/10/2010. (jws)
March 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by JIMMY EARL DAVIS to extent case may proceed w/o prepayment of entire filing fee. Plaintiff shall submit partial filing fee of $42.53 by 4/7/2010. (Fee due by 4/7/2010.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/9/2010. (Copy of order and cover letter to Dept of Corrections.) (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAVIS v. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIMMY EARL DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HASSETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?