EVANS v. ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Plaintiff: AARON EVANS
Defendant: ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 1:2010cv00048
Filed: March 29, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that case be DISMISSED without prejudice; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 6/2/11. (tss)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Stephan P Mickle on 3/10/2010. (jws)
August 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 9 MOTION to Extend Time and 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, both filed by AARON EVANS - Amended Pleadings due by 9/3/2010; signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 8/24/10 (copy to DOC) (tss)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: re 1 Complaint filed by AARON EVANS. Clerk to furnish Plaintiff w/two §1983 complaint forms w/copy of filed complaint and an application for leave to proceed informa pauperis. File amended complaint by 5/7/2010. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 4/9/2010. (Forwarded to Plaintiff §1983 Complaint forms w/complaint and IFP form.) (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVANS v. ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AARON EVANS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?