HEITZ-SHORE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: LINDA HEITZ-SHORE
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2010cv00164
Filed: August 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: ALLAN KORNBLUM
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and this case is closed pursuant to 31 Notice of Settlement. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 7/11/2011. (jws)
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Case stayed until further order of the Court. (Notify Chambers on 7/30/2011.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 6/30/2011. (jws)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Pursuant to 21 agreement, Plaintiff will appear for an Independent Medical Examination, 18 Motion to Compel Rule 35 Examination is WITHDRAWN. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 5/31/2011. (jws)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 16 MOTION for Mediation Order filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Mediation to take place by 6/15/2011.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 4/18/2011. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HEITZ-SHORE v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA HEITZ-SHORE
Represented By: MARIAN SHANDS LEE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?