REILLY v. CAMPBELL et al
Plaintiff: SEAN PATRICK REILLY
Defendant: LARRY CAMPBELL, CHUCK DAVIS, LEON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT, K PETERSEN, LUIS MORENO, LEON COUNTY, FLORIDA and ALAN GRINER
Case Number: 1:2010cv00237
Filed: November 30, 2010
Court: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Leon
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 10 First Amended Complaint filed by SEAN PATRICK REILLY: Plaintiff's 38 Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED as an abuse to judicial process and for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Defendant's 29 Counterclaim is DISMISSED. Dismissal of this case counts as a strike pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(g). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/26/2011. (jws)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 10 Amended Complaint filed by LUIS MORENO, CHUCK DAVIS, ALAN GRINER, LARRY CAMPBELL. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/21/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/8/2011. (jws)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by SEAN PATRICK REILLY. Docket shall reflect that there are 4 (four) Defendants in this action: Sheriff Larry Campbell, Major Alan Griner, Lt. Chuck Davis, and Luis Moreno, all emp loyed at the Leon County Jail, 535 Appleyard Drive, Tallahassee, Florida 32304. Clerk shall issue summonses, indicating Defendants have sixty (60) days to file a response to the complaint; refer summonses, copy of this order for each Defendant, servi ce copies of amended complaint, completed USM-285 forms, AO-398 and AO-399 forms for each Defendant, to USMS. Clerk shall forward to Plaintiff a form for consenting to trial by the magistrate judge.. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/3/2011. (Copy of order, complaint, summonses, USM-285 forms, AO-398 and AO-399 forms for each Defendat to USMS; Copy of order and consent form to Plaintiff.) (jws)
December 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 Amended Complaint filed by SEAN PATRICK REILLY. Plaintiff shall have until 1/6/2011 to provide the Court w/four (4) identical copies of the First Amended Complaint for service on the Defendants. (Service Copies due by 1/6/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/23/2010. (jws)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re 3 Financial Affidavit 4 Order. Plaintiff's inmate account information was docketed after an order was prepared and entered later the same day. As required by the Court's Order, Plaintiff must still file a Motion for IFP and file a signed Prisoner Consent Form by the deadline given. Plaintiff does not need to submit the inmate information again. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/2/2010. (jws)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by SEAN PATRICK REILLY. Clerk directed to forward to Plaintiff an application for IFP w/Prisoner Consent Form. (Fee due or Motion for IFP due by 12/31/2010.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/1/2010. (jws)(Motion for IFP w/Prisoner Consent Form to Plaintiff.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REILLY v. CAMPBELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAN PATRICK REILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LARRY CAMPBELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHUCK DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEON COUNTY SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K PETERSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LUIS MORENO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEON COUNTY, FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN GRINER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?