LEE-BOLTON et al v. KOPPERS INC et al

Plaintiff: LISA LEE-BOLTON, RICHARD BOLTON and ROY GEIERSBACH
Defendant: KOPPERS INC, BEAZER EAST INC, KOPPERS HOLDINGS INC, HEIDELBERG CEMENT AG, MCCLELLAN LOGGING INC and UNNAMED TRUCKING COMPANIES
Case Number: 1:2010cv00253
Filed: December 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: STEPHAN P MICKLE
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 797 ORDER granting 747 Koppers Inc. and Beazer East, Inc.'s Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Supplemental Expert Disclosure and Rebuttal Expert Reports. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/22/15. (grj)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER denying 412 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Jurisdictional Discovery On Defendant Beazer Limited; denying 413 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Jurisdictional Discovery On Defendant Hanson Limited; denying 414 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Jurisdictional Discovery On Defendant HeidelbergCement AG. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 10/17/13. (grj)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER deferring ruling on 10 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and granting 129 Motion to Stay - case is stayed for 120 days; signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/27/12. (tss)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER adopting 58 Report and Recommendations; DENYING 30 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 9/13/2011. (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE-BOLTON et al v. KOPPERS INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA LEE-BOLTON
Represented By: PAUL STUART ROTHSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BOLTON
Represented By: PAUL STUART ROTHSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROY GEIERSBACH
Represented By: PAUL STUART ROTHSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOPPERS INC
Represented By: BRENT ROBERT AUSTIN
Represented By: PAUL KELLER FREEBORN
Represented By: BENJAMIN HARVEY HILL, III
Represented By: DAVID A KANTER
Represented By: MEGAN COLLEEN MILLIRONS
Represented By: CASEY G REEDER
Represented By: DENNIS PARKER WAGGONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAZER EAST INC
Represented By: BRENT ROBERT AUSTIN
Represented By: PAUL KELLER FREEBORN
Represented By: BENJAMIN HARVEY HILL, III
Represented By: DAVID A KANTER
Represented By: MEGAN COLLEEN MILLIRONS
Represented By: CASEY G REEDER
Represented By: DENNIS PARKER WAGGONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOPPERS HOLDINGS INC
Represented By: BRENT ROBERT AUSTIN
Represented By: PAUL KELLER FREEBORN
Represented By: BENJAMIN HARVEY HILL, III
Represented By: DAVID A KANTER
Represented By: MEGAN COLLEEN MILLIRONS
Represented By: CASEY G REEDER
Represented By: DENNIS PARKER WAGGONER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEIDELBERG CEMENT AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCCLELLAN LOGGING INC
Represented By: RANDY FISCHER
Represented By: KELLY LYNN WILSON-TIMMINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNNAMED TRUCKING COMPANIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?