MCANULLA v. ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MCANULLA and STEPHEN J MAHER
Defendant: ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC
Case Number: 1:2010cv00255
Filed: December 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:2
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER VACATING 11 Order Dismissing Case; GRANTING 12 Joint MOTION for Settlement and release agreement. Parties' settlement and release agreement is APPROVED. Plaintiff's 1 Complaint is DISMISSED w/prejudice and this case is closed. Each party shall bear their own fees and costs except as provided in the settlement and agreement. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 4/20/2011. (jws)
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE re: 10 NOTICE of Settlement. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 3/3/11. (bkp)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC. (Answer due by 3/4/2011.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 2/18/2011. (jws)
February 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint filed by ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC. ( Answer due by 2/16/2011.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE MAURICE M PAUL on 2/3/2011. (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCANULLA v. ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MCANULLA
Represented By: ANDREW IRA GLENN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN J MAHER
Represented By: ANDREW IRA GLENN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC
Represented By: KEVIN DAVID JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?