YOUNG v. ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Plaintiff: WILLIE YOUNG
Defendant: ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 1:2011cv00205
Filed: September 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Presiding Judge: MAURICE M PAUL
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Plaintiff's 19 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice is GRANTED. Clerk instructed to close the file. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/23/2012. (jws)
March 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/5/2012. (jws)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by WILLIE YOUNG: Clerk directed to send Plaintiff a blank prisoner civil rights complaint form and instructions. Plaintiff shall fully complete complaint form and file amended complaint w/an identical copy for each Defendant. (Amended Pleadings due by 3/23/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/28/2012. (jws) (Complaint form to Plaintiff per Order.)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by WILLIE YOUNG: Clerk directed to send Plaintiff a blank motion for IFP for prisoners. (Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 2/3/2012. (Form sent to Plaintiff.) (jws)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re 6 Letter - Clerk directed to resend Plaintiff a blank motion for IFP and Notice of Change of Address forms. (Fee or Motion for IFP due by 1/13/2012.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/23/2011. (Sent Plaintiff forms per Order.) (jws)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by WILLIE YOUNG: Plaintiff shall either pay $350.00 filing fee or move for leave to proceed as a pauper. Clerk directed to send Plaintiff a blank motion for IFP. (Fee due by 10/14/2011.). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 9/29/2011. (IFP form sent to Plaintiff.) (jws)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YOUNG v. ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE YOUNG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?