GRAPSKI v. DARNELL et al
Plaintiff: |
CHARLES JAMES GRAPSKI |
Defendant: |
SADIE DARNELL, BRENDA SPENCER and LEE JACKSON |
Case Number: |
1:2011cv00276 |
Filed: |
December 22, 2011 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida |
Office: |
Gainesville Office |
County: |
Alachua |
Presiding Judge: |
GARY R JONES |
Presiding Judge: |
STEPHAN P MICKLE |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 1, 2012 |
Filing
37
ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AND REMANDING CASE: Plaintiff's claims DISMISSED for failure to comply with a court order and failure to prosecute. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. Court declines to exercise s upplemental jurisdiction over Defendant, BRENDA SPENCER's counterclaim, and case is REMANDED to Circuit Court of the Eighth Judicial Circuit, Alachua County, Florida. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 6/1/2012. (jws) (Order to Plaintiff as order directed.)
|
March 20, 2012 |
Filing
30
ORDER re 28 Fourth Motion to Withdraw as Plaintiff's Attorney is GRANTED. Attorney JAMES HADDON SULLIVAN, III terminated. Clerk directed to send copy of order to Plaintiff, CHARLES JAMES GRAPSKI, 116 Zacallo Way, Kissimm ee, FL 34743, by certified mail, return receipt requested. Plaintiff shall respond by (1) filing a notice of appearance by new lawyer, (2) filing a request for more time to find a new lawyer, or (3) filing a written notice stating will proceed pro se . Plaintiff to file response to 18 , 27 Motions to Dismiss; reply to 19 , 20 answers; and response to 20 counterclaim. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/23/2012)., Response to motion due by 4/30/2012.). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/20/2012. (jws) (Order to Plaintiff via certified mail, return receipt requested.)
|
March 13, 2012 |
Filing
24
ORDER: re 17 , 22 , 23 MOTIONS to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff filed by CHARLES JAMES GRAPSKI - Counsel needs to provide the Court w/Plaintiff address for service of future papers before the motion to withdraw can be granted. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/13/2012. (jws)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?