McCRARY v. BERRYHILL
Plaintiff: BARBARA LYNN McCRARY
Defendant: NANCY A BERRYHILL
Case Number: 1:2017cv00188
Filed: July 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Presiding Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 18 RECOMMENDED ORDER; granting 16 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/25/2018. The Clerk shall terminate the motion and close the file. (kdm)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RECOMMENDED ORDER - Accordingly, it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's unopposed motion for attorney's fees, ECF No. 16 , be GRANTED and Plaintiff awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $1,116.97 a s a reasonable EAJA attorney's fee. The Commissioner should be afforded, however, the opportunity to offset from this amount any debt owed by the Plaintiff to the United States that may be identified by the Department of Treasury and any ultimate distribution shall be made in accordance with Astrue v. Ratliff. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 1/24/2018. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 2/21/2018. (vkm)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/7/17. This case is REMANDED to the Acting Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Defendant is ordered to conduct proceedings in accordance with the Report and Recommendation. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the file. (tss)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Accordingly, it is respectfully RECOMMENDED: That Defendant=s motion to remand, ECF No. 12 , be GRANTED, and the Acting Commissioner's decision denying benefits be REVERSED. That this case be REMANDED to the Acting Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). That Defendant be ordered to conduct proceedings in accordance with this Report and Recommendation. That the clerk be directed to enter fin al judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure That the clerk be directed to administratively close this file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 11/6/2017. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/4/2017. (vkm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCRARY v. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA LYNN McCRARY
Represented By: N ALBERT BACHARACH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?