YANOPOULOS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Plaintiff: ANDREA HUDSON YANOPOULOS
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Case Number: 1:2017cv00208
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: Florida Northern District Court
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: MARK E WALKER
Referring Judge: CHARLES A STAMPELOS
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 3, 2018 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 5/3/2018. The Clerk shall enter judgment stating, "Plaintiff's motion, ECF No. 22 , is GRANTED and Plaintiff awarded atto rney's fees in the amount of $4,408.09, as a reasonable EAJA attorney's fee, $400.00 for the filing fee, and $19.77 for service of process fees, for a total payment of $4,827.86. The amount should be sent to Plaintiff& #039;s counsel's address and made payable to Plaintiff. However, the Deputy Commissioner may offset from this amount any debt owed by the Plaintiff to the United States that may be identified by the Department of Treasury and any ultimate distribution shall be made in accordance with Astrue v. Ratliff." The Clerk shall close the file. (kdm)
May 2, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Accordingly, it is respectfully recommended that Plaintiff's motion, ECF No. 22 , be GRANTED and Plaintiff awarded attorney's fees in the amount of $4,408.09 as a reasonable EAJA attorney 's fee, $400.00 for the filing fee, and $19.77 for service of process fees, for a total payment of $4,827.86. The amount should be sent to Plaintiff's counsel's address and made payable to Plaintiff. However, the Deputy Commissioner may offset from this amount any debt owed by the Plaintiff to the United States that may be identified by the Department of Treasury and any ultimate distribution shall be made in accordance with Astrue v. Ratliff. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 5/2/2018. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 5/30/2018. (vkm)
March 27, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The case is REMANDED to the Acting Commissioner for further proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. §405(g). Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/27/18. (bkp)
February 27, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING AND ADOPTING 17 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - The Acting Commissioners motion to remand, ECF No. 16, is GRANTED. This case is REMANDED to the Acting Commissioner for further proceedings pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk shall close the file. Signed by JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/26/2018. (vkm)
February 26, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Accordingly, it is respectfully RECOMMENDED: That Defendant's motion to reverse and remand, ECF No. 16 , be GRANTED, and the Acting Commissioner's decision denying benefits be REVERSED. Th at this case be REMANDED to the Acting Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. ' 405(g). That Defendant be ordered to conduct proceedings in accordance with this Report and Recommendation. That the clerk be directed to enter final judgment pursuant to Rule 58 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure That the clerk be directed to administratively close this file. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/26/2018. (vkm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: YANOPOULOS v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA HUDSON YANOPOULOS
Represented By: CHANTAL JACQUELINE HARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?