GIBSON, et al v. COWBOYS SALOON GAINESVILLE, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood, Ursula Mayes, Rachel Koren, Brooke Taylor, Sarah Stage, Cielo Jean Gibson, Alyssa Nobriga, Jessica Hinton and Dessie Mitcheson
Defendant: COWBOYS SALOON HIGH STREET, LLC, COWBOYS SALOON STAPLETON, LLC and COWBOYS SALOON GAINESVILLE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00138
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALYSSA NOBRIGA, SARAH STAGE, SARA UNDERWOOD, DESSIE MITCHESON, URSULA MAYES, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, JESSICA HINTON, RACHEL KOREN, BROOKE TAYLOR. COWBOYS SALOON STAPLETON, LLC served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (KHOMIAK, LUDMILA)
September 14, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALYSSA NOBRIGA, SARAH STAGE, SARA UNDERWOOD, DESSIE MITCHESON, URSULA MAYES, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, JESSICA HINTON, RACHEL KOREN, BROOKE TAYLOR. COWBOYS SALOON GAINESVILLE, LLC served on 8/21/2018, answer due 9/11/2018. (KHOMIAK, LUDMILA)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ALYSSA NOBRIGA, SARAH STAGE, SARA UNDERWOOD, DESSIE MITCHESON, URSULA MAYES, CIELO JEAN GIBSON, JESSICA HINTON, RACHEL KOREN, BROOKE TAYLOR. COWBOYS SALOON HIGH STREET, LLC served on 9/6/2018, answer due 9/27/2018. (KHOMIAK, LUDMILA)
July 20, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to COWBOYS SALOON GAINESVILLE, LLC, COWBOYS SALOON HIGH STREET, LLC, COWBOYS SALOON STAPLETON, LLC. (kdm)
July 20, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
July 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Summons as to Defendant Cowboys Saloon Stapleton, LLC by Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Rachel Koren, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Alyssa Nobriga, Sarah Stage, Brooke Taylor, Sara Underwood (KHOMIAK, LUDMILA)
July 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Summons as to Defendant Cowboys Saloon High Street, LLC by Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Rachel Koren, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Alyssa Nobriga, Sarah Stage, Brooke Taylor, Sara Underwood (KHOMIAK, LUDMILA)
July 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Summons as to Defendant Cowboys Saloon Gainesville, LLC by Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Rachel Koren, Ursula Mayes, Dessie Mitcheson, Alyssa Nobriga, Sarah Stage, Brooke Taylor, Sara Underwood (KHOMIAK, LUDMILA)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4234512.), filed by Alyssa Nobriga, Sarah Stage, Sara Underwood, Dessie Mitcheson, Ursula Mayes, Cielo Jean Gibson, Jessica Hinton, Rachel Koren, Brooke Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Gibson, #2 Exhibit B- Mitcheson, #3 Exhibit C- Nobriga, #4 Exhibit D- Hinton, #5 Exhibit E- Taylor, #6 Exhibit F- Stage, #7 Exhibit G- Mayes, #8 Exhibit H- Underwood, #9 Exhibit I- Koren, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (KHOMIAK, LUDMILA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GIBSON, et al v. COWBOYS SALOON GAINESVILLE, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Underwood
Represented By: LUDMILA KHOMIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Mayes
Represented By: LUDMILA KHOMIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Koren
Represented By: LUDMILA KHOMIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Taylor
Represented By: LUDMILA KHOMIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Stage
Represented By: LUDMILA KHOMIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cielo Jean Gibson
Represented By: LUDMILA KHOMIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Nobriga
Represented By: LUDMILA KHOMIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hinton
Represented By: LUDMILA KHOMIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dessie Mitcheson
Represented By: LUDMILA KHOMIAK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COWBOYS SALOON HIGH STREET, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COWBOYS SALOON STAPLETON, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COWBOYS SALOON GAINESVILLE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?