RIVERA MADERA et al v. DETZNER et al
Plaintiff: MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, UNIDOSUS, HISPANIC FEDERATION, FAITH IN FLORIDA, VAMOS4PR and Marta Valentina Rivera Madera
Defendant: KIM A BARTON, KEN DETZNER and FSASE
Case Number: 1:2018cv00152
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED #66 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 10/10/18. The parties shall file their respective documents on or before 10/26/2018. (tss)
October 9, 2018 Filing 66 MOTION to Extend TimeUNOPPOSED by KEN DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' #64 MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/28/2018. Mr. Bains has fulfilled the requirements of the Local Rules for appearing pro hac vice. (kdm)
September 27, 2018 Filing 64 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Chiraag Bains.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4298745.) by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing) (BAINS, CHIRAAG)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED #62 MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. (Parties to file their respective documents on or before: 10/12/2018). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/19/2018. (kdm)
September 17, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION to Extend Timeof Deadlines (Unopposed) by KEN DETZNER. (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
September 11, 2018 Filing 61 NOTICE Secretary's Notice of Compliance by KEN DETZNER re #57 Order,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
September 11, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of KEN DETZNER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN PART. IT IS ORDERED: The Secretary shall provide written direction to the supervisors of elections in the 32 counties identified supra at 4 n.7. The Secretary of State shall copy this Order in his written direction to the supervisors of elections. The Secretary of State shall provide this Court notice of compliance with this Order on or before Wednesday, 9/12/2018. The Secretary of State's motion to dismiss, ECF No. #42 , is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/10/2018. (kjw)
September 8, 2018 Filing 58 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of preliminary injunction Proceedings held on 9/5/2018, before Judge Mark E. Walker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Megan Hague, Telephone number 8504220011. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/14/2018. (mah)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN PART. IT IS ORDERED: The Secretary shall provide written direction to the supervisors of elections in the 32 counties identified supra at 4 n.6. The Secretary of State shall copy this Order in his written direction to the supervisors of elections. The Secretary of State shall provide this Court notice of compliance with this Order on or before Wednesday,9/12/2018. The Secretary of State's motion to dismiss, ECF No. #42 , is DENIED. Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction, ECF No. #2 , is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/7/2018. (kjw)
September 5, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Filing Lux Deposition by KEN DETZNER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lux Deposition - Jacobson et al v. Detzner (418-cv-00262-MW-CAS), #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Lux Deposition) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
September 5, 2018 Filing 55 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Motion Hearing held on 9/5/2018. Court hears argument from both sides regarding the #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Written order to follow. Court denies #53 Motion to Exclude Testimony, Clerk to terminate motion. Court directs Defense to refile deposition of Paul Lux - Defense Exhibit 1 - 2018 Voter Assistance Hotline Frequently Asked Questions - Marked and Admitted (Court Reporter Megan Hague). (vkm)
September 4, 2018 Filing 54 AFFIDAVIT Second Declaration of Ahren Lahvis by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (WACHSPRESS, MEGAN)
September 4, 2018 Filing 53 MOTION Exclude Testimony of Paul Lux re #51 Notice (Other) by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Matthew J. Murray in Support of Motion to Exclude Testimony of Paul Lux) (WACHSPRESS, MEGAN)
September 4, 2018 Filing 52 NOTICE TO PARTIES signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/4/18. In preparation for hearing, 29 Notice of Hearing on Motion, the parties shall be prepared to identify and discuss the services already available in Spanish via the Voter Assistance Hotline advertised on the Department of States website, dos.myflorida.com/elections. (tss)
September 4, 2018 Filing 51 NOTICE Secretary's Witness List by KEN DETZNER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
September 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED #44 MOTION signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/4/18. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to Defendant Bartons motion to dismiss on or before 14 days after this Court issues its order on Plaintiffs pending motion for preliminary injunction. Further, this Court acknowledges receipt of Plaintiffs reply in support of their motion to dismiss and opposition to Defendant Detzners #45 motion to dismiss. (tss)
September 3, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE OF REFILING OF CORRECTED DECLARATION OF MARTA RIVERA MADERA WITH CERTIFICATION OF TRANSLATOR by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #25 Affidavit, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit CORRECTED DECLARATION OF MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA) (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
September 3, 2018 Filing 47 AFFIDAVIT re #45 Reply to Response to Motion,,, DECLARATION OF CORINNE F. JOHNSON by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21) (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
September 3, 2018 Filing 46 AFFIDAVIT re #45 Reply to Response to Motion,,, SECOND DECLARATION OF STUART C. NAIFEH by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
September 3, 2018 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Opposition to Secretary of State Detzner's Motion to Dismiss filed by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit SECOND DECLARATION OF MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, #2 Affidavit OF ELIZA MCCLENAGHAN, #3 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF ELIZA MCCLENAGHAN, #4 Affidavit OF ERNST THERVIL, #5 Exhibit 1 TO DECLARATION OF ERNST THERVIL, #6 Exhibit 2 TO DECLARATION OF ERNST THERVIL, #7 Exhibit 3 TO DECLARATION OF ERNST THERVIL, #8 Exhibit 4 TO DECLARATION OF ERNST THERVIL, #9 Exhibit 5 TO DECLARATION OF ERNST THERVIL, #10 Affidavit SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF DR. DANIEL A. SMITH, #11 Affidavit SECOND DECLARATION OF KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT, #12 Exhibit 1 TO SECOND DECLARATION OF KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT) (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
September 3, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to File Joint Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Opposition to Secretary's Motion to Dismiss and Extend Time for Opposition to Supervisor Barton's Motion to Dismiss re #41 Response in Opposition to Motion, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #42 Response in Opposition to Motion, by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
September 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #43 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DECLARATIONS signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/1/18. The declarations are accepted as timely filed and shall be considered at the preliminary injunction hearing. (tss)
August 31, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Declarations of Earley and Scott by KEN DETZNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Earley Declaration (Leon County), #2 Exhibit Scott Declaration (Brevard County)) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
August 30, 2018 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Secretary's Motion to Dismiss and Response in Opposition to Request for Preliminary Injunction filed by KEN DETZNER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 2-23) (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
August 30, 2018 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by KIM A BARTON. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Kim Barton, #2 Affidavit Declaration of William Boyett) (SWAIN, ROBERT)
August 30, 2018 Filing 40 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by FSASE . (LAVIA, JOHN)
August 30, 2018 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by ESPERANZA SEGARRA on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SEGARRA, ESPERANZA)
August 29, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN T LAVIA, III on behalf of FSASE (LAVIA, JOHN)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING #36 MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Attorney DAVID ANDREW FUGETT terminated. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/27/2018. The Clerk shall disconnect Mr. Fugett from receipt of CM/ECF notices in this case. This Court notes that Defendant is still represented by counsel. (kdm)
August 27, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by KEN DETZNER. (FUGETT, DAVID)
August 24, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR re #25 Affidavit, Proof of Service on Defendants (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
August 24, 2018 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR re #17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corinne Johnson.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263015.), #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stacey Leyton.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263020.), #13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Megan Wachspress.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263038.), #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole G. Berner.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263049.), #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263002.), #19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Murray.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263025.), #18 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #20 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 7 Notice of Hearing,,,,, #6 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings Proof of Service on Defendants (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
August 24, 2018 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR re #5 MOTION to Certify Class of Defendants, #3 Affidavit,,,, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint, #4 MOTION to Certify Class of Plaintiffs, #8 Summons Issued Proof of Service on Defendant Kim Barton (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
August 24, 2018 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR re #5 MOTION to Certify Class of Defendants, #3 Affidavit,,,, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #1 Complaint, #4 MOTION to Certify Class of Plaintiffs, #8 Summons Issued Proof of Service on Defendant Ken Detzner (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #30 MOTION TO APPEAR AS AMICUS CURIAE. (The Association may file amicus brief on or before midnight on - 9/3/2018). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/23/2018. (kdm)
August 23, 2018 Filing 30 Motion to appear as Amicus Curiae by RONALD A LABASKY on behalf of FSASE. (LABASKY, RONALD) Modified on 8/23/2018 (bkp).
August 23, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2018 at 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/TiAnn StarkCourtroom Deputy Clerk (tss)
August 22, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL on behalf of KEN DETZNER (JAZIL, MOHAMMAD)
August 22, 2018 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/21/2018. Argument to the Court by attorneys Murray, Swain, Fugett, and Jazil. The Preliminary Injunction Hearing is scheduled for 9/5/2018 09:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. No discovery schedule is being set at this time. A joint Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due by 8/30/2018; Replies are due by 9/3/2018 at midnight. A notice on any live witnesses is due by 9/4/2018 at noon. The ore tenus motion by Plaintiffs to extend time to deadline for filing responses to the class certification motions - GRANTED BY THE COURT - the deadline for the response to class certification is 14 days after the ruling on the motion for preliminary injunction. (Court Reporter Megan Hague.) (kjw) Modified on 8/22/2018 to correct the date the hearing was held. (kjw)
August 21, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by CORBIN FREDERICK HANSON on behalf of KIM A BARTON (HANSON, CORBIN)
August 21, 2018 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction CORRECTED DECLARATION OF MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed STUART C NAIFEH for HISPANIC FEDERATION,STUART C NAIFEH for MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND,STUART C NAIFEH for MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA,STUART C NAIFEH for UNIDOSUS,STUART C NAIFEH for VAMOS4PR). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/21/18. (bkp)
August 21, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF *TELEPHONIC* HEARING: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2018 04:00 PM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. You may dial into the conference call as early as 3:50 PM EST. Call in number: 888-684-8852. When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136#. If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565#. Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking.s/ Kimberly WestphalDeputy Clerk The quality of the audio connection is compromised by the use of cell phones or speakerphones and counsel are requested not to use those devices during the call. (kjw)
August 20, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stuart C. Naifeh.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4264660.) by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (NAIFEH, STUART)
August 20, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN on behalf of KIM A BARTON (SWAIN, ROBERT)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS for FAITH IN FLORIDA,MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS for HISPANIC FEDERATION,MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS for MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND,MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS for MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA,MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS for UNIDOSUS,MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS for VAMOS4PR). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/17/18. (bkp)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY for FAITH IN FLORIDA,MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY for HISPANIC FEDERATION,MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY for MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND,MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY for MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA,MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY for UNIDOSUS,MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY for VAMOS4PR). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/17/18. (bkp)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed STACEY MONICA LEYTON for FAITH IN FLORIDA,STACEY MONICA LEYTON for HISPANIC FEDERATION,STACEY MONICA LEYTON for MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND,STACEY MONICA LEYTON for MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA,STACEY MONICA LEYTON for UNIDOSUS,STACEY MONICA LEYTON for VAMOS4PR). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/17/18. (bkp)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed CORINNE F JOHNSON for FAITH IN FLORIDA,CORINNE F JOHNSON for HISPANIC FEDERATION,CORINNE F JOHNSON for MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND,CORINNE F JOHNSON for MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA,CORINNE F JOHNSON for UNIDOSUS,CORINNE F JOHNSON for VAMOS4PR). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/17/18. (bkp)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed STEPHEN PAUL BERZON for FAITH IN FLORIDA,STEPHEN PAUL BERZON for HISPANIC FEDERATION,STEPHEN PAUL BERZON for MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND,STEPHEN PAUL BERZON for MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA,STEPHEN PAUL BERZON for UNIDOSUS,STEPHEN PAUL BERZON for VAMOS4PR). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/17/18. (bkp)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Appointed NICOLE GINA BERNER for MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND,NICOLE GINA BERNER for VAMOS4PR). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/17/18. (bkp)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nicole G. Berner.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263049.) by MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, VAMOS4PR. (BERNER, NICOLE)
August 17, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Megan Wachspress.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263038.) by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (WACHSPRESS, MEGAN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Murray.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263025.) by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (MURRAY, MATTHEW)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stacey Leyton.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263020.) by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (LEYTON, STACEY)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Corinne Johnson.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263015.) by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (JOHNSON, CORINNE)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4263002.) by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (BERZON, STEPHEN)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to KIM A BARTON, KEN DETZNER. (Attachments: #1 Detzner) (bkp)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 04:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court also asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audioconnection is comprised by these devices. Note: If you or any party, witness or attorney in this matter has a disability that requires special accommodations, such as a hearing impairment that requires a sign-language interpreter or a wheelchair restriction that requires ramp access, please contact the Clerk's Office at least one week prior to the hearing (or as soon as possible) so arrangements can be made. s/ TiAnn Stark Courtroom Deputy Clerk (tss)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING CONFERENCE SCHEDULE signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/16/18 - Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2018 at 04:00 PM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER (tss)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class of Defendants by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, Marta Valentina Rivera Madera, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/30/2018). (Attachments: #1 SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF STUART NAIFEH, #2 Exhibit A TO DECLARATION OF STUART NAIFEH, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Certify Class of Plaintiffs by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, Marta Valentina Rivera Madera, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/30/2018). (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF STEPHEN P. BERZON, #2 DECLARATION OF KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT, #3 Text of Proposed Order) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, Marta Valentina Rivera Madera, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG, #34 Exhibit HH, #35 Exhibit II, #36 Exhibit JJ, #37 Exhibit KK, #38 Exhibit LL, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit SS, #46 Exhibit TT) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by FAITH IN FLORIDA, HISPANIC FEDERATION, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, Marta Valentina Rivera Madera, UNIDOSUS, VAMOS4PR. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF MARTA VALENTINA RIVERA MADERA, #2 DECLARATION OF DR. DANIEL A. SMITH, #3 DECLARATION OF AHREN LAHVIS, #4 DECLARATION OF PETER MASON, #5 DECLARATION OF NANCY BATISTA, #6 DECLARATION OF JOSE CALDERON, #7 DECLARATION OF CLARISSA MARTINEZ DE CASTRO, #8 DECLARATION OF WES LATHROP, #9 DECLARATION OF ARMANDO SANTIAGO PINTADO, #10 Text of Proposed Order) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KIM A BARTON, KEN DETZNER ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4261528.), filed by VAMOS4PR, Marta Valentina Rivera Madera, MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND, HISPANIC FEDERATION, FAITH IN FLORIDA, UNIDOSUS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Kim A. Barton, #3 Summons for Ken Detzner) (ROMERO-CRAFT, KIRA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RIVERA MADERA et al v. DETZNER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIM A BARTON
Represented By: ROBERT CHARLES SWAIN
Represented By: CORBIN FREDERICK HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN DETZNER
Represented By: JESSE CRAIG DYER
Represented By: MOHAMMAD OMAR JAZIL
Represented By: MALCOLM NOBLE MEANS
Represented By: DAVID ANDREW FUGETT
Represented By: GARY VERGIL PERKO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FSASE
Represented By: RONALD A LABASKY
Represented By: JOHN T LAVIA, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MI FAMILIA VOTA EDUCATION FUND
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: STACEY MONICA LEYTON
Represented By: CORINNE F JOHNSON
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: ESPERANZA SEGARRA
Represented By: NICOLE GINA BERNER
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Represented By: STEPHEN PAUL BERZON
Represented By: KATHERINE ROBERSON-YOUNG
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY
Represented By: MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIDOSUS
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: STACEY MONICA LEYTON
Represented By: CORINNE F JOHNSON
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: ESPERANZA SEGARRA
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Represented By: STEPHEN PAUL BERZON
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY
Represented By: MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HISPANIC FEDERATION
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: STACEY MONICA LEYTON
Represented By: CORINNE F JOHNSON
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: ESPERANZA SEGARRA
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Represented By: STEPHEN PAUL BERZON
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY
Represented By: MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAITH IN FLORIDA
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: STACEY MONICA LEYTON
Represented By: CORINNE F JOHNSON
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: ESPERANZA SEGARRA
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Represented By: STEPHEN PAUL BERZON
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY
Represented By: MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VAMOS4PR
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: STACEY MONICA LEYTON
Represented By: CORINNE F JOHNSON
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: ESPERANZA SEGARRA
Represented By: NICOLE GINA BERNER
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Represented By: STEPHEN PAUL BERZON
Represented By: KATHERINE ROBERSON-YOUNG
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY
Represented By: MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta Valentina Rivera Madera
Represented By: KIRA ROMERO-CRAFT
Represented By: STACEY MONICA LEYTON
Represented By: CORINNE F JOHNSON
Represented By: CHIRAAG BAINS
Represented By: ESPERANZA SEGARRA
Represented By: STUART C NAIFEH
Represented By: STEPHEN PAUL BERZON
Represented By: MATTHEW JOHN MURRAY
Represented By: MEGAN CLAIRE WACHSPRESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?