MSPA CLAIMS 1 LLC v. TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE CO et al

Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC and MSPA CLAIMS 1 LLC
Defendant: Tower Hill Claims Service, LLC, TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE CO and TOWER HILL CLAIMS SERVICE LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00157
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Gainesville Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike Class Allegations by TOWER HILL CLAIMS SERVICE LLC, TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE CO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (SMITH, NICOLE)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/8/2018). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/12/2018. (atm)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint,, by TOWER HILL CLAIMS SERVICE LLC, TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE CO. (SMITH, NICOLE)
August 29, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by MSPA CLAIMS 1 LLC. (PORTAL, JANPAUL)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TOWER HILL CLAIMS SERVICE LLC, TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE CO. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (bkp)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (PORTAL, JANPAUL)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE CO, Tower Hill Claims Service, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4263484.), filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - LLR Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - MSPA Assignment, #3 Exhibit C - FHCP and LLR Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - Diagnostic Codes, #5 Exhibit E - Tower Hill Settlement, #6 Exhibit F - MSP Reporting Data, #7 Exhibit G - Defendants' MSP Reporting Data, #8 Exhibit H - MyAbility Report, #9 Exhibit I - Notice of Lien to Tower Hill, #10 Exhibit J - Tower Hill Response to Lien Notice, #11 Exhibit K - 411.25 Notice to Defendants, #12 Summons - Tower Hill Prime, #13 Summons - Tower Hill Claims) (PORTAL, JANPAUL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSPA CLAIMS 1 LLC v. TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE CO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: JANPAUL PORTAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA CLAIMS 1 LLC
Represented By: JANPAUL PORTAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Hill Claims Service, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE CO
Represented By: NICOLE SIEB SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWER HILL CLAIMS SERVICE LLC
Represented By: NICOLE SIEB SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?